|
08.07.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2019 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.07.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.07.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
23.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2019 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.02.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
27.02.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
20.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.11.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
56 |
|
20.11.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.11.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
20.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.08.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.04.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.04.2018 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
19.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2017 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2017 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2017 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
10.08.2017 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.06.2017 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2017 |
Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.04.2017 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2017 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2017 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.03.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
31.03.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.07.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.2016 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
29 |