Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016092733 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014251449 | 12.12.2014 | WO2015JP05376 | 27.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10590504 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2020 | B2 | US2017321297 | 09.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014251449 | 12.12.2014 | WO2015JP05376 | 27.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102000854B | Global Dossier | 16.07.2019 | B1 | KR20170075796 | 03.07.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014251449 | 12.12.2014 | WO2015JP05376 | 27.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2016092733 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2017 | A1 | JP5991450B | 14.09.2016 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014251449 | 12.12.2014 | WO2015JP05376 | 27.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107002198B | Global Dossier | 28.05.2019 | B | CN107002198 | 01.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014251449 | 12.12.2014 | WO2015JP05376 | 27.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3187613 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2019 | B1 | EP3187613 | 15.11.2017 | A4 | EP3187613 | 05.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014251449 | 12.12.2014 | WO2015JP05376 | 27.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2017007511 | 22.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014251449 | 12.12.2014 | WO2015JP05376 | 27.10.2015 |