EP3190085 - METHOD FOR PREPARING GRAPHENE BY USING HIGH SPEED HOMOGENIZATION PRETREATMENT AND HIGH PRESSURE HOMOGENIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128 Yeoui-daero Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2017/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Seung Bo LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
KWON, Won Jong LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
PARK, Se Ho LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Mi Jin LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
SOHN, Kwon Nam LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2017/28] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2017/28] | Application number, filing date | 15867942.3 | 10.12.2015 | [2017/28] | WO2015KR13531 | Priority number, date | KR20140178603 | 11.12.2014 Original published format: KR 20140178603 | [2017/28] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016093645 | Date: | 16.06.2016 | Language: | KO | [2016/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3190085 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3190085 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C01B32/182, C01B32/225, B82Y30/00, B82Y40/00, C01B32/19 | [2017/39] | CPC: |
C01B32/19 (EP,US);
C01B32/192 (KR);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
C01B32/225 (EP,US);
C01B2204/32 (US)
|
Former IPC [2017/28] | C01B32/182 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GRAPHEN DURCH VERWENDUNG DER BEHANDLUNG MIT HOCHSCHNELLER HOMOGENISIERUNG UND HOCHDRUCKHOMOGENISIERUNG | [2017/28] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING GRAPHENE BY USING HIGH SPEED HOMOGENIZATION PRETREATMENT AND HIGH PRESSURE HOMOGENIZATION | [2017/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE GRAPHÈNE À L'AIDE D'UN PRÉTRAITEMENT PAR HOMOGÉNÉISATION À UNE VITESSE ÉLEVÉE ET D'UNE HOMOGÉNÉISATION À HAUTE PRESSION | [2017/28] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2017 | Translation filed | 07.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 07.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/28] | 07.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.12.2015 | AL | 18.03.2020 | AT | 18.03.2020 | CY | 18.03.2020 | CZ | 18.03.2020 | DK | 18.03.2020 | EE | 18.03.2020 | ES | 18.03.2020 | FI | 18.03.2020 | HR | 18.03.2020 | IT | 18.03.2020 | LT | 18.03.2020 | LV | 18.03.2020 | MC | 18.03.2020 | MK | 18.03.2020 | MT | 18.03.2020 | NL | 18.03.2020 | PL | 18.03.2020 | RO | 18.03.2020 | RS | 18.03.2020 | SE | 18.03.2020 | SI | 18.03.2020 | SK | 18.03.2020 | SM | 18.03.2020 | TR | 18.03.2020 | BG | 18.06.2020 | NO | 18.06.2020 | GR | 19.06.2020 | IS | 18.07.2020 | PT | 12.08.2020 | IE | 10.12.2020 | LU | 10.12.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 10.12.2015 | |
AL | 18.03.2020 | ||
AT | 18.03.2020 | ||
CY | 18.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
MT | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
TR | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
IE | 10.12.2020 | ||
LU | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 10.12.2015 | |
AT | 18.03.2020 | ||
CY | 18.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
MT | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
TR | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
IE | 10.12.2020 | ||
LU | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
IE | 10.12.2020 | ||
LU | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
IE | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
NO | 18.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO2011019095 (BARO TECH CO LTD N [KR], et al) [Y] 1,3,5-13 * paragraph [0047]; claim 7 * [A] 2,4; | [YA]KR20130004638 (WORLDTUBE CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1,5-13 * example 1; claim 1 * [A] 2-4; | [E]EP3157864 (DIRECTA PLUS SPA [IT]) [E] 1-3,5,6,9-13 * page 8 - page 10; example 9; claim 1 *; | [YA] - MIN YI - ZHLGANG SHEN . JINYANG ZHU ED - CHEN XIAO-YA ET AL, "A fluid dynamics route for producing graphene and its analogues", SCIENCE BULLETIN, vol. 59, no. 16, doi:10.1007/S11434-014-0303-9, ISSN 2095-9273, (20140404), pages 794 - 799, (20140404), XP008180820 [Y] 1,3,5-13 * Experimental * [A] 2,4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11434-014-0303-9 | [YA] - ZHIGANG SHEN ET AL, "Preparation of graphene by jet cavitation;Preparation of graphene by jet cavitation", NANOTECHNOLOGY, IOP, BRISTOL, GB, (20110816), vol. 22, no. 36, doi:10.1088/0957-4484/22/36/365306, ISSN 0957-4484, page 365306, XP020210085 [Y] 1,3,5-13 * Experimental details;; figure 1b * [A] 2,4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-4484/22/36/365306 | [A] - FRANCESCO BONACCORSO ET AL, "Production and processing of graphene and 2d crystals", MATERIALSTODAY, (20121201), vol. 15, no. 12, doi:10.1016/S1369-7021(13)70014-2, pages 564 - 589, XP055270320 [A] 1-13 * page 569 - page 571 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1369-7021(13)70014-2 | International search | [Y]KR20130004638 (WORLDTUBE CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-13 * See paragraphs [0037], [0040], [0043], [0046]-[0047]; claim 2; and figure 3. *; | [A]US2014044968 (PAPAKONSTANTINOU PAGONA [GB], et al) [A] 1-13* See abstract; paragraphs [0026]-[0029]; and claims 1,2. *; | [Y] - YI, MIN et al., "A Fluid Dynamics Route for Producing Graphene and Its Analogues", Chinese Science Builetin, vol. 59, no. 16, (20140404), pages 1794 - 1799, XP 008180820 [Y] 1-13 * See page 1795, left column, lines 13-27; page 1795, right column, lines 8-12; page 1797, right column, lines 1-7; and figures 1-2, 5. * | [A] - PATON, KEITH R. et al., "Scalable Production of Large Quantities of Defect-Free Few-Layer Graphene by Shear Exfoliation in Liquids", Nature Materials, vol. 13, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1038/nmat3944, (20140420), pages 624 - 630, XP 055122783 [A] 1-13 * See page 625, left column, lines 2-7; page 629, left column, lines 16-19; and figure 1. * | [A] - LIANG, SHUAISHUAI et al., "One-Step Green Synthesis of Graphene Nanomesh by Fluid-based Method", RSC Advances, vol. 4, no. 31, (20140402), pages 16127 - 16131, XP055338643 [A] 1-13 * See abstract; page 16127, right column, line 6-page 16128, left column, line 16; and figures 1-2. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C4RA01250J |