EP3216791 - POLYMORPHIC SUBSTANCE OF YONKENAFIL HYDROCHLORIDE, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, AND COMPOSITION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yangtze River Pharmaceutical Group Co., Ltd. No.1 Yangzijiangnan Road Taizhou, Jiangsu 225321 / CN | [2017/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Haibo No.1 Yangzijiangnan Road Taizhou Jiangsu 225321 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Lingwu No.1 Yangzijiangnan Road Taizhou Jiangsu 225321 / CN | 03 /
LU, Xianfeng No.1 Yangzijiangnan Road Taizhou Jiangsu 225321 / CN | 04 /
LIANG, Huixing No.1 Yangzijiangnan Road Taizhou Jiangsu 225321 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Yongfeng No.1 Yangzijiangnan Road Taizhou Jiangsu 225321 / CN | 06 /
SHI, Lianyong No.1 Yangzijiangnan Road Taizhou Jiangsu 225321 / CN | 07 /
LUO, Hongpeng No.1 Yangzijiangnan Road Taizhou Jiangsu 225321 / CN | [2017/37] | Representative(s) | Biggi, Cristina Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti 17 20158 Milano / IT | [2017/37] | Application number, filing date | 15869159.2 | 19.11.2015 | [2017/37] | WO2015CN95059 | Priority number, date | CN201410799600 | 19.12.2014 Original published format: CN201410799600 | [2017/37] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016095650 | Date: | 23.06.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3216791 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3216791 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, A61P1/04, A61P3/10, A61P9/04, A61P9/10, A61P11/02, A61P11/06, A61P13/10, A61P15/06, A61P17/06, A61P17/14, A61P25/02, A61P25/08, A61P25/28, A61P35/04, A61P37/08, A61K31/519, A61P1/00 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/06 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP,RU);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2017/37] | C07D487/04, A61K31/519, A61P15/10, A61P15/00, A61P13/00, A61P9/00, A61P11/00, A61P27/06, A61P1/00, A61P25/00, A61P17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYMORPHE SUBSTANZ VON YONKENAFIL-HYDROCHLORID, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2017/37] | English: | POLYMORPHIC SUBSTANCE OF YONKENAFIL HYDROCHLORIDE, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, AND COMPOSITION AND USE THEREOF | [2017/37] | French: | SUBSTANCE POLYMORPHE DE CHLORHYDRATE DE YONKENAFIL, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION, COMPOSITION À BASE DE LADITE SUBSTANCE ET UTILISATION DELADITE SUBSTANCE | [2017/37] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2017 | Translation filed | 09.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/37] | 09.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.11.2015 | AL | 11.05.2022 | AT | 11.05.2022 | CY | 11.05.2022 | EE | 11.05.2022 | FI | 11.05.2022 | HR | 11.05.2022 | LT | 11.05.2022 | LV | 11.05.2022 | MC | 11.05.2022 | MK | 11.05.2022 | MT | 11.05.2022 | RO | 11.05.2022 | RS | 11.05.2022 | SI | 11.05.2022 | SK | 11.05.2022 | SM | 11.05.2022 | BG | 11.08.2022 | IS | 11.09.2022 | IE | 19.11.2022 | LU | 19.11.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 19.11.2015 | |
AL | 11.05.2022 | ||
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CY | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
MK | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
IE | 19.11.2022 | ||
LU | 19.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 19.11.2015 | |
AL | 11.05.2022 | ||
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CY | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
IE | 19.11.2022 | ||
LU | 19.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 19.11.2015 | |
AL | 11.05.2022 | ||
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
IE | 19.11.2022 | ||
LU | 19.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
IE | 19.11.2022 | ||
LU | 19.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
LU | 19.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1634883 (TIANJIN TASLY GROUP CO LTD [CN], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 14; claims 1-10; compound 1HCl *; | [A] - CAIRA, "Crystalline Polymorphism of Organic Compounds", TOPICS IN CURRENT CHEMIS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (19980101), vol. 198, ISSN 0340-1022, pages 163 - 208, XP008166276 [A] 1-15 * chapter 3.1; page 165 - page 166 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-69178-2_5 | International search | [A]CN1552714 (BEIFANG SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY D [CN]) [A] 1-16* description, pages 19 and 20, the preparation of compound 1 *; | [PX]CN104530054 (YANGTZE RIVER PHARM GROUP CO) [PX] 1-16 * description, paragraphs [0007]-[0030] * |