Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11682908 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2023 | B2 | US2018248396 | 30.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715854544 | 26.12.2017 | US201414572757 | 16.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102561386B | Global Dossier | 28.07.2023 | B1 | KR20230098707 | 04.07.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414572757 | 16.12.2014 | WO2015US60945 | 16.11.2015 | KR20177013068 | 16.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102549071B | Global Dossier | 28.06.2023 | B1 | KR20170095820 | 23.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414572757 | 16.12.2014 | WO2015US60945 | 16.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6882174B | Global Dossier | 02.06.2021 | B2 | JP2018504875 | 15.02.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414572757 | 16.12.2014 | WO2015US60945 | 16.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106937534B | Global Dossier | 24.11.2020 | B | CN106937534 | 07.07.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414572757 | 16.12.2014 | WO2015US60945 | 16.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3235099 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2018 | A4 | EP3235099 | 25.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414572757 | 16.12.2014 | WO2015US60945 | 16.11.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016099744 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414572757 | 16.12.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9853471 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2017 | B2 | US2016172886 | 16.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414572757 | 16.12.2014 |