EP3235099 - MECHANISM FOR EXTENDING CYCLE LIFE OF A BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2017/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEATES, Andrew 256 Montclair Rd. Los Gatos, Oregon 95032 / US | [2017/43] | Representative(s) | HGF Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/43] | HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 15870568.1 | 16.11.2015 | [2017/43] | WO2015US60945 | Priority number, date | US201414572757 | 16.12.2014 Original published format: US201414572757 | [2017/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016099744 | Date: | 23.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3235099 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, G01R31/36, H01M10/44 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
H02J7/0071 (EP,CN,US);
H02J7/0048 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H02J7/00 (CN,US);
H01M10/4257 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H02J7/00036 (KR);
H02J7/00047 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] | Title | German: | MECHANISMUS ZUR VERLÄNGERUNG DER LEBENSDAUER EINER BATTERIE | [2017/43] | English: | MECHANISM FOR EXTENDING CYCLE LIFE OF A BATTERY | [2017/43] | French: | MÉCANISME PERMETTANT DE PROLONGER LA DURÉE DE VIE D'UNE BATTERIE | [2017/43] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/43] | 11.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2013257382 (FIELD J DOUGLAS [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7-10,12-15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0022] - [0027]; figure 4 * [A] 4,6 [I] 3,11; | [XI]US2014217958 (VERDUN GARY JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-10,12-15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0008] , [0009] , [0010] , [0012] , [0062]; figure 6 *[I] 3,11 | International search | [A]JP2005037230 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs 36-41, claim 1, and figure 3. *; | [X]JP2007323999 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1-20 * See paragraphs 20-23, 44-45, claims 1-4, and figures 1-2. *; | [A]US2008136368 (HAJIAGHAJANI MASOUD [US]) [A] 1-20 * See abstract, and claims 1-4. *; | [A]WO2009049227 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See page 9, line 14 - page 11, line 11, claim 1, and figure 4. *; | [A]JP2011235849 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs 25-28, claim 1, and figure 2. * |