Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3233250
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
22.10.2021 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
22.07.2021 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.02.2021 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.01.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.09.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] |
14.09.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] |
10.03.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.02.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
23.02.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
06.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.09.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
22.09.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
22.09.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
04.09.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.09.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.08.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.08.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.06.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.06.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|