EP3232863 - VIAL HOLDER DEVICES, METHODS AND SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gyroscope Therapeutics Limited Rolling Stock Yard 188 York Way London N7 9AS / GB | [2021/34] |
Former [2020/43] | For all designated states Gyroscope Therapeutics Limited Stevenage Bioscience Catalyst Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage SG1 2FX / GB | ||
Former [2019/16] | For all designated states Orbit Biomedical Limited 8 Bloomsbury Street 2nd Floor London WC1B 3SR / GB | ||
Former [2017/43] | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARSON, Chaley 200 Tournament Drive Horsham, Pennsylvania 19044 / US | 02 /
LILOVA, Kostadinka 1400 McKean Road Spring House, Pennsylvania 19477 / US | 03 /
CANNAMELA, Mike 601 W 26th Street New York, New York 10001 / US | 04 /
CAGNEY, William 200 Tournament Drive Horsham, Pennsylvania 19044 / US | 05 /
KOSOVAN, Gordon 1000 US 202 Raritan, New Jersey 08869 / US | 06 /
HUGHES, Elaine 200 Tournament Drive Horsham, Pennsylvania 19044 / US | 07 /
FICCHI, Maria 200 Great Valley Parkway Malvern, Pennsylvania 19355 / US | [2017/43] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2017/43] | Application number, filing date | 15871161.4 | 18.12.2015 | [2017/43] | WO2015US66657 | Priority number, date | US201462093887P | 18.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462093887 P | [2017/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016100808 | Date: | 23.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3232863 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3232863 | Date: | 25.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61J1/16, A61B50/30, // A47G23/02 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
A61J1/16 (EP,KR,US);
B65D25/205 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B50/20 (EP,US);
A61B50/30 (EP,US);
A61B90/90 (EP,US);
B65B3/003 (US);
B65B3/006 (EP,US);
B65D23/0885 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B65D77/0446 (EP,CN,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/43] | A47G23/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHIOLENHALTERVORRICHTUNGEN, -VERFAHREN UND -SYSTEME | [2017/43] | English: | VIAL HOLDER DEVICES, METHODS AND SYSTEMS | [2017/43] | French: | DISPOSITIFS FORMANT RÉCEPTACLES À FLACONS, PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES | [2017/43] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/43] | 24.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24182352.5 / EP4406507 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004112781 (HOFVERBERG NIKLAS [SE], et al); | [XI]US2007181446 (DONAHOE RYAN M [US], et al); | [A]US2010038273 (JOHNSON DAVID T [US]) | International search | [A]WO9636437 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al); | [A]US5934099 (COOK SANFORD L [US], et al); | [XYA]US6662941 (LOWRY JAMES [US], et al); | [A]US2012065611 (MUSANI ALI I [US]); | [Y]US2014263319 (FAZI BRUNO [US], et al) | by applicant | US2007181446 |