24.02.2023 |
Refusal of application |
published on 29.03.2023 [2023/13] |
30.12.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.11.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
05.11.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
30.03.2022 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
27.12.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.12.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.11.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.08.2020 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.06.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.10.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.06.2019 |
First examination report |
|
05.06.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.01.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.12.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.06.2018 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
15.06.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
02.03.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
02.03.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
03.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.09.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
29.09.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
29.09.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
04.09.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.08.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.08.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.07.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.07.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
19.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.07.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.07.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|