EP3125573 - BONE CONDUCTION HEADPHONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Temco Japan Co., Ltd. 21-4, Hounan 2-chome Suginami-ku Tokyo 168-0062 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2017/05] | For all designated states Temco Japan Co., Ltd. 21-4, Hounan 2-chome Suginami-ku Tokyo 168-0062 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUDA Mikio c/o TEMCO JAPAN CO. LTD. 21-4 Hounan 2-chome Suginami-ku Tokyo 168-0062 / JP | [2017/05] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [2017/05] | Application number, filing date | 15872552.3 | 17.11.2015 | [2017/05] | WO2015JP82250 | Priority number, date | JP20140259684 | 24.12.2014 Original published format: JP 2014259684 | [2017/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016103983 | Date: | 30.06.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3125573 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/10, H04R1/00, H04R25/00 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
H04R1/1091 (EP);
H04R1/26 (EP);
H04R1/028 (EP);
H04R1/1075 (EP);
H04R2460/13 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2017/05] | H04R1/10, H04R1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/05] | Title | German: | KNOCHENLEITENDER KOPFHÖRER | [2017/05] | English: | BONE CONDUCTION HEADPHONE | [2017/05] | French: | CASQUE D'ÉCOUTE À CONDUCTION OSSEUSE | [2017/05] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2016 | Translation filed | 24.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/05] | 24.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/41] | 17.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPS59191996 (TSUTSUMI SHIGERU) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [I] 3,4; | [XI]US2013051585 (KARKKAINEN LEO [FI], et al) [X] 1,4 * the whole document * [I] 2,3; | [XI]WO2010114195 (VONIA CORP [KR], et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [I] 3,4; | [XI]KR20060043937 (JUSEONG TECHNO PARK [KR]) [X] 1,3 * the whole document * [I] 2,4; | [XI]US2009154755 (YAMAGISHI MAKOTO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-4 | International search | [XY]JP2011512745 (Bone Tone Communications Ltd.) [X] 1, 3 * , paragraphs [0049] to [0051]; fig. 2B & US 2011/0301729 A1 paragraphs [0059] to [0061]; fig. 2B & WO 2009/101622 A2 & EP 002250822 A * [Y] 2, 4; | [Y]JP2004266321 (HITACHI MAXELL) [Y] 2, 4 * , paragraphs [0070] to [0072]; fig. 8 & US 2006/0120546 A1 & WO 2004/066599 A1 & EP 001587285 A1 & CN 001742476 A *; | [Y]WO2007069784 (TEMCO JAPAN [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * , paragraph [0004]; fig. 4, 5 & CN 001984505 A * |