EP3240147 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A ROTARY-ELECTRIC-MACHINE STATOR COIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/44] | ROTATING-ELECTRIC-MACHINE STATOR COIL, ROTATING-ELECTRIC-MACHINE STATOR PROVIDED WITH SAID COIL, AND ROTATING ELECTRIC MACHINE PROVIDED WITH SAID STATOR | ||
[2022/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Astemo, Ltd. 2520, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | [2021/39] |
Former [2017/44] | For all designated states Hitachi Automotive Systems, Ltd. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUDA Tomohiro c/o Hitachi Astemo, Ltd. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | 02 /
NAKAYAMA Kenichi c/o Hitachi Astemo, Ltd. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | 03 /
OJIMA Kazuo c/o Hitachi Astemo, Ltd. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | 04 /
ONOSE Shin c/o Hitachi Astemo, Ltd. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | 05 /
SHIMIZU Hisaya c/o Hitachi Astemo, Ltd. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | 06 /
YAMAZAKI Shinji c/o Hitachi Astemo, Ltd. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | [2022/32] |
Former [2017/44] | 01 /
FUKUDA Tomohiro c/o HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS, LTD. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAYAMA Kenichi c/o HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS, LTD. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | |||
03 /
OJIMA Kazuo c/o HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS, LTD. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | |||
04 /
ONOSE Shin c/o HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS, LTD. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | |||
05 /
SHIMIZU Hisaya c/o HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS, LTD. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | |||
06 /
YAMAZAKI Shinji c/o HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS, LTD. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2017/44] | Application number, filing date | 15872558.0 | 18.11.2015 | [2017/44] | WO2015JP82330 | Priority number, date | JP20140263810 | 26.12.2014 Original published format: JP 2014263810 | [2017/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016103989 | Date: | 30.06.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3240147 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3240147 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H02K3/12, H02K15/00 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
H02K3/12 (EP,US);
H02K3/28 (US);
H01R4/021 (US);
H01R4/022 (US);
H02K15/0068 (US);
H02K15/0081 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/44] | H02K3/28, H02K3/04, H02K3/50, H02K15/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER STATORSPULE EINER ROTIERENDE ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINE | [2022/10] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A ROTARY-ELECTRIC-MACHINE STATOR COIL | [2022/10] | French: | MÉTHODE DE FABRICATION D'UNE BOBINE DE STATOR DE MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE ROTATIVE | [2022/10] |
Former [2017/44] | STATORSPULE EINER ROTIERENDEN ELEKTRISCHEN MASCHINE, MIT BESAGTER SPULE AUSGESTATTETER STATOR EINER ROTIERENDEN ELEKTRISCHEN MASCHINE UND MIT BESAGTEM STATOR AUSGESTATTETE ROTIERENDE ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINE | ||
Former [2017/44] | ROTATING-ELECTRIC-MACHINE STATOR COIL, ROTATING-ELECTRIC-MACHINE STATOR PROVIDED WITH SAID COIL, AND ROTATING ELECTRIC MACHINE PROVIDED WITH SAID STATOR | ||
Former [2017/44] | BOBINE DE STATOR DE MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE ROTATIVE, STATOR DE MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE ROTATIVE ÉQUIPÉ DE LADITE BOBINE ET MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE ROTATIVE ÉQUIPÉE DUDIT STATOR | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2017 | Translation filed | 26.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 26.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/44] | 06.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.11.2015 | AL | 10.08.2022 | AT | 10.08.2022 | BG | 10.08.2022 | CY | 10.08.2022 | CZ | 10.08.2022 | DK | 10.08.2022 | EE | 10.08.2022 | ES | 10.08.2022 | FI | 10.08.2022 | HR | 10.08.2022 | IT | 10.08.2022 | LT | 10.08.2022 | LV | 10.08.2022 | MC | 10.08.2022 | MK | 10.08.2022 | MT | 10.08.2022 | NL | 10.08.2022 | PL | 10.08.2022 | RO | 10.08.2022 | RS | 10.08.2022 | SE | 10.08.2022 | SI | 10.08.2022 | SK | 10.08.2022 | SM | 10.08.2022 | NO | 10.11.2022 | GR | 11.11.2022 | GB | 18.11.2022 | IE | 18.11.2022 | LU | 18.11.2022 | BE | 30.11.2022 | CH | 30.11.2022 | FR | 30.11.2022 | LI | 30.11.2022 | IS | 10.12.2022 | PT | 12.12.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 18.11.2015 | |
AL | 10.08.2022 | ||
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
BG | 10.08.2022 | ||
CY | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
IT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
MK | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
GB | 18.11.2022 | ||
IE | 18.11.2022 | ||
LU | 18.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 18.11.2015 | |
AL | 10.08.2022 | ||
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CY | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
IT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
MK | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
GB | 18.11.2022 | ||
IE | 18.11.2022 | ||
LU | 18.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HU | 18.11.2015 | |
AL | 10.08.2022 | ||
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CY | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
IT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
GB | 18.11.2022 | ||
IE | 18.11.2022 | ||
LU | 18.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 18.11.2015 | |
AL | 10.08.2022 | ||
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CY | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
GB | 18.11.2022 | ||
IE | 18.11.2022 | ||
LU | 18.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 18.11.2015 | |
AL | 10.08.2022 | ||
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
GB | 18.11.2022 | ||
IE | 18.11.2022 | ||
LU | 18.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
GB | 18.11.2022 | ||
IE | 18.11.2022 | ||
LU | 18.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
GB | 18.11.2022 | ||
IE | 18.11.2022 | ||
LU | 18.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
GB | 18.11.2022 | ||
IE | 18.11.2022 | ||
LU | 18.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
GB | 18.11.2022 | ||
LU | 18.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
LU | 18.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 10.08.2022 | |
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 10.08.2022 | |
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 10.08.2022 | |
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 10.08.2022 | |
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 10.08.2022 | |
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 10.08.2022 | |
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 10.08.2022 | |
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 10.08.2022 | |
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 10.08.2022 | |
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1126579 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 3,4 * paragraph [0028]; figure 10 *; | [XY]US2002041129 (OOHASHI ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8-10 * paragraphs [0067] - [0074]; figures 1,4,9,10 * [Y] 2-4,7; | [X]JP2009081980 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,5,6,8-10* paragraphs [0026] , [0036] - [0039]; figures 2,4,10,11 *; | [Y]US2010001609 (ISHIGAMI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0090]; figure 9 *; | [Y]US2014042865 (MOUROU JULIEN P [US], et al) [Y] 2 * paragraph [0031]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US2014070646 (ISODA HITOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0050]; figure 3 * | International search | [A]JP2002119003 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-10 * , paragraphs [0033] to [0039]; fig. 3 to 4 & US 2002/0041129 A1 paragraphs [0065] to [0075]; fig. 3 to 4 *; | [A]JP2012257366 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-10* , paragraphs [0019], [0033]; fig. 1, 10 (Family: none) * | Examination | DE102006019314 |