EP3237234 - TIRE TREAD FOR REDUCING NOISE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2020 [2020/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin 23 place des Carmes-Déchaux 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | [2018/44] |
Former [2017/44] | For all designated states Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin 12 Cours Sablon 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | ||
For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEZUKA, Takashi c/o NIHON MICHELIN TIRE Co. LTD. Shinjuku Park Tower 13F 3-7-1 Nishi-shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-1073 / JP | [2017/44] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2017/44] | Application number, filing date | 15873230.5 | 17.12.2015 | [2017/44] | WO2015JP86150 | Priority number, date | WO2014JP84760 | 26.12.2014 Original published format: PCT/JP2014/084760 | [2017/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016104662 | Date: | 30.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3237234 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60C11/13, B60C11/03, B60C11/00, B60C19/00 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
B60C11/1369 (EP,US);
B29C33/123 (US);
B60C11/0306 (EP,US);
B60C19/002 (EP,US);
B60C11/1353 (US);
B60C2011/0348 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/44] | B60C11/03, B60C11/00, B60C11/13 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] | Title | German: | REIFENLAUFFLÄCHE ZUR GERÄUSCHMINDERUNG | [2017/44] | English: | TIRE TREAD FOR REDUCING NOISE | [2017/44] | French: | BANDE DE ROULEMENT DE PNEU DESTINÉE À RÉDUIRE LE BRUIT | [2017/44] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/44] | 27.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/06] | 11.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH06135208 (HONBO TOMIO) [X] 1-6,8,9 * the whole document *; | [AD]JP2011255716 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [AD] 1-9* figures 1-4 * | International search | [A]JPS55113606U (SATO, Masanori) [A] 1-9 * , page 2, lines 2-6, figures 1-2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH06135208 (HONBO TOMIO) [A] 1-9 * , paragraphs [0016]-[0017],[0028], figures 1-2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2002331526 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-9 * , paragraph [0002], figure 4 (Family: none) *; | [A]US5022448 (OCHIAI KIYOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-9 * , column 1,line 64 - column 2,line 2,figures 1-7 & JP 2-57407 A & EP 342908 A2 *; | [A]JPH0740705 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-9 * , claim 1, figure 1 (Family: none) * |