EP3242348 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING POSITIVE ACTIVE MATERIAL PRECURSOR AND POSITIVE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERIES, EXHIBITING CONCENTRATION GRADIENT, AND POSITIVE ACTIVE MATERIAL PRECURSOR AND POSITIVE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERIES, EXHIBITING CONCENTRATION GRADIENT, PRODUCED BY SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV, PT | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ECOPRO BM CO., LTD. 100, 2 Sandan-ro Ochang-eup Cheongwon-gu Cheongju-si, Chungcheongbuk-do 28117 / KR | [2017/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Moon Ho 206-901 32 Ochangjungang-ro Ochang-eup Cheongwon-gu Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 363-785 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jik Soo 503-306, 64, Ochangjungang-ro Ochang-eup Cheongwon-gu Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do, 28124 / KR | 03 /
YUN, Jin Kyeong 302 52-16 Yullyang-ro 138beon-gil Cheongwon-gu Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 363-215 / KR | 04 /
JEON, Suk Yong 103-101 46 Gugwoncho 1-gil Chungju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 380-110 / KR | 05 /
JUNG, Jae Yong 505-502 148 Jungheung-ro Sangdang-gu Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 360-778 / KR | 06 /
SUNG, Yong Chul 406-401, 167, 2sandan-ro Ochang-eup Cheongwon-gu Chungju-si, Chungcheongbuk-do, 28117 / KR | [2017/51] |
Former [2017/47] | 01 /
CHOI, Moon Ho 206-901 32 Ochangjungang-ro Ochang-eup Cheongwon-gu Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 363-785 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Jik Soo 64, Ochangjungang-ro Ochang-eup Cheongwon-gu Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do, 28124 / KR | |||
03 /
YUN, Jin Kyeong 302 52-16 Yullyang-ro 138beon-gil Cheongwon-gu Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 363-215 / KR | |||
04 /
JEON, Suk Yong 103-101 46 Gugwoncho 1-gil Chungju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 380-110 / KR | |||
05 /
JUNG, Jae Yong 505-502 148 Jungheung-ro Sangdang-gu Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 360-778 / KR | |||
06 /
SUNG, Yong Chul 167, 2sandan-ro Ochang-eup Cheongwon-gu Chungju-si, Chungcheongbuk-do, 28117 / KR | |||
Former [2017/45] | 01 /
CHOI, Moon Ho 206-901 32 Ochangjungang-ro Ochang-eup Cheongwon-gu Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 363-785 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Jik Soo 503-306 64 Ochangjungang-ro Ochang-eup Cheongwon-gu Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 363-885 / KR | |||
03 /
YUN, Jin Kyeong 302 52-16 Yullyang-ro 138beon-gil Cheongwon-gu Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 363-215 / KR | |||
04 /
JEON, Suk Yong 103-101 46 Gugwoncho 1-gil Chungju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 380-110 / KR | |||
05 /
JUNG, Jae Yong 505-502 148 Jungheung-ro Sangdang-gu Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 360-778 / KR | |||
06 /
SUNG, Yong Chul 20-2 Geumbong 1-gil Chungju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 380-090 / KR | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2024/01] |
Former [2017/45] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15875469.7 | 24.07.2015 | [2017/45] | WO2015KR07718 | Priority number, date | KR20140195306 | 31.12.2014 Original published format: KR 20140195306 | [2017/45] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016108375 | Date: | 07.07.2016 | Language: | KO | [2016/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3242348 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3242348 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.07.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/36, H01M4/525, H01M4/505, H01M10/0525, C01G53/00 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M4/366 (EP,KR,US);
C01G53/00 (KR);
C01G53/006 (EP,US);
C01G53/44 (EP,US);
H01M10/052 (KR);
H01M4/505 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/525 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2002/50 (US);
C01P2002/85 (EP,US);
C01P2004/03 (EP,US);
C01P2006/40 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/45] | H01M4/36, H01M4/525, H01M4/505, H01M10/052 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES POSITIVAKTIVMATERIALVORLÄUFERS UND POSITIVAKTIVMATERIAL FÜR LITHIUMSEKUNDÄRBATTERIEN MIT KONZENTRATIONSGRADIENT UND NACH DIESEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTER POSITIVAKTIVMATERIALVORLÄUFER UND POSITIVAKTIVMATERIAL FÜR LITHIUMSEKUNDÄRBATTERIEN MIT KONZENTRATIONSGRADIENT | [2017/45] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING POSITIVE ACTIVE MATERIAL PRECURSOR AND POSITIVE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERIES, EXHIBITING CONCENTRATION GRADIENT, AND POSITIVE ACTIVE MATERIAL PRECURSOR AND POSITIVE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERIES, EXHIBITING CONCENTRATION GRADIENT, PRODUCED BY SAME | [2017/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE PRÉCURSEUR DE MATÉRIAU ACTIF POSITIF ET DE MATÉRIAU ACTIF POSITIF POUR BATTERIES SECONDAIRES AU LITHIUM PRÉSENTANT UN GRADIENT DE CONCENTRATION, ET PRÉCURSEUR DE MATÉRIAU ACTIF POSITIF ET MATÉRIAU ACTIF POSITIF POUR BATTERIES SECONDAIRES AU LITHIUM PRÉSENTANT UN GRADIENT DE CONCENTRATION PRODUITS SELON CE DERNIER | [2017/45] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2017 | Translation filed | 31.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 31.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/45] | 31.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.01.2024 | BG | 03.01.2024 | CZ | 03.01.2024 | ES | 03.01.2024 | HR | 03.01.2024 | LT | 03.01.2024 | LV | 03.01.2024 | NL | 03.01.2024 | NO | 03.04.2024 | RS | 03.04.2024 | GR | 04.04.2024 | IS | 03.05.2024 | PT | 03.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 03.01.2024 | |
BG | 03.01.2024 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2024 | ||
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 03.01.2024 | |
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 03.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2013002457 (ECOPRO CO LTD [KR], et al); | [XI]US2013202966 (YU JONG-RYEOL [KR], et al); | [XI]WO2014178625 (IUCF HYU [KR]); | US2016049650 [ ] (NOH HYUNG-JOO [KR], et al) | International search | [A]KR100752703B (IUCF HYU [KR]); | [A]KR20110083383 (ECOPRO CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20120079801 (IUCF HYU [KR]); | [A]KR20130080565 (UNIV KOREA NAT TRANSP IND ACAD COOP FOUND [KR]); | [A]KR20130111413 (IUCF HYU [KR]) |