EP3240545 - BIARYLETHER IMIDAZOPYRAZINE BTK INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [2017/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Jian 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 02 /
KOZLOWSKI, Joseph, A. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 03 /
BOGA, Sobhana Babu 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 04 /
GAO, Xiaolei 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 05 /
GUIADEEN, Deodialsingh 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 06 /
WANG, Jyhshing 47 Unami Terrace Westfield, New Jersey 07090 / US | [2017/45] | Representative(s) | Jaap, David Robert Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 120 Moorgate London, EC2M 6UR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/45] | Jaap, David Robert MSD Hertford Road Hoddesdon, Herts EN11 9BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 15875971.2 | 17.12.2015 | [2017/45] | WO2015US66223 | Priority number, date | WO2014CN95826 | 31.12.2014 Original published format: PCT/CN2014/095826 | [2017/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016109219 | Date: | 07.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3240545 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.07.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, A61K31/4985, A61P11/00, A61P37/06, A61P29/00, A61P37/00, A61P11/06, A61P19/02, A61P3/10, A61K45/06 | [2018/23] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
A61K31/4985 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP,US);
A61P11/06 (EP,US);
A61P19/02 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP,US);
A61P3/10 (EP,US);
A61P37/00 (EP,US);
A61P37/06 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/45] | A61K31/5377, A61K31/55, C07D487/04, A61K31/541 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/45] | Title | German: | BIARYLETHER-IMIDAZOPYRAZIN-BTK-HEMMER | [2017/45] | English: | BIARYLETHER IMIDAZOPYRAZINE BTK INHIBITORS | [2017/45] | French: | COMPOSÉS BIARYLÉTHER IMIDAZOPYRAZINE UTILISÉS COMME INHIBITEURS DE LA BTK | [2017/45] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 31.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/45] | 08.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/24] | 23.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2013113097 (BETA PHARMA CANADA INC [CA]) [A] 1-12 * claims 1, 4, 5, 9, 10 * * paragraph [0002] *; | [A]WO2014187319 (JIANGSU MEDOLUTION LTD [CN]) [A] 1-12* claims 1, 9, 10, 13 * | International search | [XY]US2009286768 (CREW ANDREW P [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * ; pg. 122, example 171, pg. 142, example 231, para [0599], [0602] * [Y] 8-12; | [A]WO2010126960 (LOCUS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2012100138 (BUGGY JOSEPH J [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * ; entire document *; | [A]WO2013010380 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) [A] 1-12* ; entire document *; | [Y]US2014336206 (HONIGBERG LEE [US], et al) [Y] 8-12 * ; para [0027], [0052], [0170]-[0171], [0454] * |