Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10317125 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2019 | B2 | US2017097184 | 06.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201510009262 | 07.01.2015 | WO2015CN95263 | 23.11.2015 | CN201510107398 | 11.03.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20170056515 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201510009262 | 07.01.2015 | WO2015CN95263 | 23.11.2015 | CN201510107398 | 11.03.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6632534B | Global Dossier | 22.01.2020 | B2 | JP2017508122 | 23.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201510009262 | 07.01.2015 | WO2015CN95263 | 23.11.2015 | CN201510107398 | 11.03.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106032958B | Global Dossier | 19.10.2018 | B | CN106032958 | 19.10.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201510009262 | 07.01.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3091315 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2021 | B8 | EP3091315 | 11.08.2021 | B1 | EP3091315 | 23.08.2017 | A4 | EP3091315 | 09.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201510009262 | 07.01.2015 | WO2015CN95263 | 23.11.2015 | CN201510107398 | 11.03.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016110161 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201510009262 | 07.01.2015 | CN201510107398 | 11.03.2015 |