EP3244095 - WAVE GENERATOR AND WAVE GEARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harmonic Drive Systems Inc. 25-3, Minamioi 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0013 / JP | [2017/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAYASHI Masaru c/o HARMONIC DRIVE SYSTEMS INC. Hotaka-kojo 1856-1 Hotakamaki Azumino-shi Nagano 399-8305 / JP | 02 /
HOSHINA Tatsuro c/o HARMONIC DRIVE SYSTEMS INC. Hotaka-kojo 1856-1 Hotakamaki Azumino-shi Nagano 3998305 / JP | [2017/46] | Representative(s) | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Pelkovenstraße 143 80992 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/46] | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15876855.6 | 08.01.2015 | [2017/46] | WO2015JP50359 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016110978 | Date: | 14.07.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3244095 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.07.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F16H1/32, F16C19/26, F16C33/46, F16C35/073, F16C19/22 | [2018/31] | CPC: |
F16C33/4605 (EP,KR,US);
F16H49/001 (KR,US);
F16C19/225 (EP,US);
F16C19/26 (EP,KR,US);
F16C19/305 (US);
F16C33/467 (US)
|
Former IPC [2017/46] | F16H1/32, F16C19/26, F16C33/46, F16C35/073 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/46] | Title | German: | WELLENGENERATOR UND WELLENGETRIEBE | [2017/46] | English: | WAVE GENERATOR AND WAVE GEARING | [2017/46] | French: | GÉNÉRATEUR D'ONDES ET ENGRENAGE À ONDES | [2017/46] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2017 | Translation filed | 08.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 08.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/46] | 08.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/31] | 13.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2355770 (NSK LTD [JP]) [Y] 1 * page 17, line l - page 18, line 11 ** page 24, line 14 - page 25, line 5; figures 1,5,7,8 *; | [Y]WO2014181375 (HARMONIC DRIVE SYSTEMS [JP]) [Y] 1 * the whole document *; | US2016025203 [ ] (HOSHINA TATSURO [JP], et al) [ ] * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1,2,3b * | International search | [Y]JPS4821046U (Harmonic Drive Systems Inc.) [Y] 7-8 * , fig. 4 to 5 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH01119959U (Harmonic Drive Systems Inc.) [Y] 7-8 * , fig. 1 to 2 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2007010012 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD, et al) [Y] 3-4, 8 * , paragraph [0005]; fig. 3 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2007239834 (JTEKT CORP) [A] 3 * , fig. 12 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2008164149 (JTEKT CORP) [Y] 1-5, 7-8 * , paragraph [0031]; fig. 5 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2011190826 (MATEX KK) [Y] 2, 5, 8 * , paragraphs [0014], [0028]; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2013015191 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES) [A] 6, 9* , paragraphs [0022], [0037] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2014092208 (JTEKT CORP) [Y] 1-5, 7-8 * , paragraph [0029]; fig. 3 (Family: none) *; | [YA]WO2014181375 (HARMONIC DRIVE SYSTEMS [JP]) [Y] 1-5, 7-8 * , entire text; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) * [A] 6, 9; | [Y]WO2014181376 (HARMONIC DRIVE SYSTEMS [JP]) [Y] 3-4, 8 * , fig. 2 (Family: none) * |