Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018265681 | Global Dossier | 20.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2015002165 | 08.01.2015 | WO2015JP86547 | 28.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2016111233 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2015002165 | 08.01.2015 | WO2015JP86547 | 28.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107108967 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2015002165 | 08.01.2015 | WO2015JP86547 | 28.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3243872 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2017 | A4 | EP3243872 | 15.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2015002165 | 08.01.2015 | WO2015JP86547 | 28.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016111233 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2015002165 | 08.01.2015 |