EP3243872 - RUBBER COMPOSITION, TREAD MEMBER AND PNEUMATIC TIRE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING RUBBER COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2017/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKURAI, Hideyuki c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2017/46] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2017/46] | Application number, filing date | 15877105.5 | 28.12.2015 | [2017/46] | WO2015JP86547 | Priority number, date | JP20150002165 | 08.01.2015 Original published format: JP 2015002165 | [2017/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016111233 | Date: | 14.07.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3243872 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.07.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C08L7/00, B60C1/00, C08K3/04, C08K3/36, C08K5/25, C08L57/02, C08L61/10, C08L93/04, C08L101/00 | [2017/46] | CPC: |
C08L7/00 (EP,US);
B60C1/0016 (EP,US);
C08K3/04 (EP,US);
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
C08K3/36 (EP,US);
C08K5/09 (EP,US);
C08K5/132 (EP,US);
C08K5/18 (EP,US);
C08K5/25 (EP,US);
C08K5/47 (EP,US);
C08K5/548 (EP,US);
C08L101/00 (EP,US);
C08L57/02 (EP,US);
C08L9/00 (EP,US);
C08L91/00 (EP,US);
C08L93/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L7/00, C08L9/00, C08L57/02, C08L91/00, C08K5/25, C08K3/04, C08K3/36, C08K5/548, C08K5/09, C08K3/22, C08K5/18, C08K5/47 (EP,US);
C08L7/00, C08L9/00, C08L91/00, C08K5/09, C08K5/25, C08K3/04, C08K3/36, C08K5/548, C08K5/09, C08K3/22, C08K5/18, C08K5/47 (US,EP);
C08L7/00, C08L9/00, C08L91/00, C08K5/132, C08K5/25, C08K3/04, C08K3/36, C08K5/548, C08K5/09, C08K3/22, C08K5/18, C08K5/47 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/46] | Title | German: | KAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNG, PROFILELEMENT UND LUFTREIFEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER KAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2017/46] | English: | RUBBER COMPOSITION, TREAD MEMBER AND PNEUMATIC TIRE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING RUBBER COMPOSITION | [2017/46] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELLE-CI, ÉLÉMENT POUR BANDE DE ROULEMENT, ET PNEUMATIQUE | [2017/46] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2017 | Translation filed | 07.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 07.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/46] | 07.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012270966 (THUILLIEZ JULIEN [FR], et al) [X] 1-8 * table 1 * * example AJ; tables 4a-4b * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0128] *; | [I]FR2940299 (MICHELIN SOC TECH [FR], et al) [I] 1-8 * example B * * page 10 * | International search | [A]JP2013144761 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-8 * , entire text & US 2014/0329946 A1 & WO 2013/058390 A1 & EP 2770022 A1 & CN 103890074 A *; | [A]JP2014501827 (Compagnie Generale des Etablissements Michelin) [A] 1-8 * , entire text & US 2013/0289165 A1 & WO 2012/084821 A1 & EP 2655495 A1 & FR 2969165 A & FR 2969165 A1 & CN 103261300 A *; | [A]JP2012513517 (Societe de Technologie Michelin) [A] 1-8 * , entire text & US 2012/0270966 A1 & WO 2010/072762 A1 & EP 2382264 A1 & FR 2940298 A1 & CN 102257056 A *; | [A]JP2009256540 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-8 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2008189911 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-8 * , entire text (Family: none) * |