EP3246899 - RANDOM NUMBER EXPANDING DEVICE, RANDOM NUMBER EXPANDING METHOD, AND RANDOM NUMBER EXPANDING PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2017/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGAWARA, Takeshi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2017/47] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2017/47] | Application number, filing date | 15877838.1 | 15.01.2015 | [2017/47] | WO2015JP50979 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016113886 | Date: | 21.07.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3246899 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G09C1/00, H04L9/10 | [2017/47] | CPC: |
H04L9/004 (EP);
G06F7/58 (US);
G06F17/16 (US);
G09C1/00 (EP,US);
H04L9/0869 (EP);
H04L9/0894 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUFALLSZAHLERWEITERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, ZUFALLSZAHLERWEITERUNGSVERFAHREN UND ZUFALLSZAHLERWEITERUNGSPROGRAMM | [2017/47] | English: | RANDOM NUMBER EXPANDING DEVICE, RANDOM NUMBER EXPANDING METHOD, AND RANDOM NUMBER EXPANDING PROGRAM | [2017/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'EXTENSION DE NOMBRE ALÉATOIRE, PROCÉDÉ D'EXTENSION DE NOMBRE ALÉATOIRE ET PROGRAMME D'EXTENSION DE NOMBRE ALÉATOIRE | [2017/47] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2017 | Translation filed | 14.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/47] | 14.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.11.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2010002959 (NEC ELECTRONICS CORP, et al) [A] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0034] to [0036]; fig. 4 (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2013121736 (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0021] to [0031], [0116], [0118] to [0119]; fig. 1 to 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]US2013230170 (CHABANNE HERVE [FR], et al) [A] 1-8* , paragraphs [0037] to [0043] & EP 2638660 A1 & WO 2012/062994 A1 & FR 2967322 A1 & AU 2011327986 A & CA 2816933 A & SG 190188 A & IL 226229 D & CN 103404073 A * |