EP3228841 - SUPERCHARGING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SUPERCHARGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/41] | SUPERCHARGING SYSTEM, CONTROL DEVICE FOR SUPERCHARGING SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SUPERCHARGING SYSTEM | ||
[2021/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2017/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMASHITA, Yukio c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 02 /
KUBO, Hiroyoshi c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 03 /
GOTO, Mitsufumi c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 04 /
SAKAMOTO, Musashi c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2017/41] | Representative(s) | Mader, Joachim, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2021/31] |
Former [2017/41] | Hess, Peter K. G. Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15879989.0 | 30.01.2015 | [2017/41] | WO2015JP52657 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016121092 | Date: | 04.08.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3228841 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3228841 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F02B39/10, F02B37/24, F02B37/00, F02B37/013, F02B37/10 | [2018/23] | CPC: |
F02B37/24 (EP,US);
F02B37/004 (EP,US);
F02B37/013 (EP,US);
F02B37/10 (EP,US);
F02B39/10 (EP,US);
F02D2009/0283 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/41] | F02B39/10, F02B37/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFLADESYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES AUFLADESYSTEMS | [2021/10] | English: | SUPERCHARGING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SUPERCHARGING SYSTEM | [2021/10] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SURALIMENTATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT DE SYSTÈME DE SURALIMENTATION | [2021/10] |
Former [2017/41] | AUFLADESYSTEM, STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR AUFLADESYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES AUFLADESYSTEMS | ||
Former [2017/41] | SUPERCHARGING SYSTEM, CONTROL DEVICE FOR SUPERCHARGING SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SUPERCHARGING SYSTEM | ||
Former [2017/41] | SYSTÈME DE SURALIMENTATION, DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR SYSTÈME DE SURALIMENTATION, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT DE SYSTÈME DE SURALIMENTATION | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2017 | Translation filed | 04.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/41] | 04.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.01.2015 | AL | 04.08.2021 | AT | 04.08.2021 | CY | 04.08.2021 | CZ | 04.08.2021 | DK | 04.08.2021 | EE | 04.08.2021 | ES | 04.08.2021 | FI | 04.08.2021 | HR | 04.08.2021 | IT | 04.08.2021 | LT | 04.08.2021 | LV | 04.08.2021 | MC | 04.08.2021 | MK | 04.08.2021 | MT | 04.08.2021 | NL | 04.08.2021 | PL | 04.08.2021 | RO | 04.08.2021 | RS | 04.08.2021 | SE | 04.08.2021 | SI | 04.08.2021 | SK | 04.08.2021 | SM | 04.08.2021 | BG | 04.11.2021 | NO | 04.11.2021 | GR | 05.11.2021 | IS | 04.12.2021 | PT | 06.12.2021 | GB | 30.01.2022 | IE | 30.01.2022 | LU | 30.01.2022 | BE | 31.01.2022 | CH | 31.01.2022 | FR | 31.01.2022 | LI | 31.01.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 30.01.2015 | |
AL | 04.08.2021 | ||
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CY | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
MK | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
GB | 30.01.2022 | ||
IE | 30.01.2022 | ||
LU | 30.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 30.01.2015 | |
AL | 04.08.2021 | ||
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CY | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
GB | 30.01.2022 | ||
IE | 30.01.2022 | ||
LU | 30.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 30.01.2015 | |
AL | 04.08.2021 | ||
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
GB | 30.01.2022 | ||
IE | 30.01.2022 | ||
LU | 30.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
GB | 30.01.2022 | ||
IE | 30.01.2022 | ||
LU | 30.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
GB | 30.01.2022 | ||
LU | 30.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
GB | 30.01.2022 | ||
LU | 30.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
GB | 30.01.2022 | ||
LU | 30.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
GB | 30.01.2022 | ||
LU | 30.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
LU | 30.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP1300562 (VISTEON GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [Y] 2-4 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0004] , [ 0023] - [0025] - [ 0031] , [ 0039] , [ 0049] - [0051] - [ 0053]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0054] , [ 0060] , [ 0062] * [A] 1; | [XYI]EP1749990 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,10-12 * paragraphs [0012] , [ 0019] , [ 0020] , [ 0027] , [ 0042] , [ 0047] - [0054]; figures 2, 5, 6 * [Y] 2-9 [I] 2-9; | [Y]JP2007262970 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 5-9 * paragraphs [0007] , [ 0011] , [ 0014] , [ 0017] , [ 0018] , [ 0021] , [ 0024] , [ 0025]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0031] , [ 0034] *; | [Y]EP2006507 (ABB TURBO SYSTEMS AG [CH]) [Y] 6-9* paragraphs [0006] , [ 0010] , [ 0012]; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]JP2007262970 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-2, 10-12 * , paragraphs [0014] to [0042]; fig. 1 to 2 (Family: none) *; | [XYA]JP4295753B (Honda Motor Co., Ltd.) [X] 1-2, 11-12 * , paragraphs [0023] to [0055]; fig. 2 to 6 & JP 2006-144776 A & US 2007/0033938 A1 & EP 1749990 A2 * [Y] 1-2, 10-12 [A] 3-9; | [A]JP4433051B (Toyota Motor Corp.) [A] 1-12* , paragraphs [0042] to [0060]; fig. 1, 5 & WO 2007/055094 A1 & DE 112006003091 T5 & CN 101305171 A *; | [A]JP2013181392 (DAIMLER AG) [A] 1-12 * , paragraphs [0029] to [0031]; fig. 2, 4 (Family: none) * |