|
09.06.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.06.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.03.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.03.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
11.03.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
10.03.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.12.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
30.12.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.12.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
30.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2020 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2020 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2020 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2020 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.09.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
17.09.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.09.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
17.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.05.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.05.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.01.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.09.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.04.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.02.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.11.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.11.2018 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
15.11.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
15.11.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
15.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2018 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2018 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.05.2018 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2018 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2017 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2017 |
Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2017 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Comments on Written Opinion of ISA |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
09.08.2017 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Comments on Written Opinion of ISA |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.06.2017 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.08.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2016 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2016 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
36 |