13.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
29.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
27.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
16.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] |
02.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
11.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2022 [2022/50] |
21.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] |
14.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
26.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
10.06.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
20.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
18.03.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] |
18.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
11.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
04.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
02.07.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] |
25.06.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
25.06.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.06.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.03.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.02.2021 |
Change - German title |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
05.02.2021 |
Change - English title |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
05.02.2021 |
Change - French title |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.01.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.09.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.05.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.01.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.01.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.09.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.04.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.02.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
02.02.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.12.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.12.2018 |
First examination report |
|
19.11.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
08.05.2018 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
04.05.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
04.05.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
06.04.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.05.2018 [2018/19] |
31.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.09.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
08.09.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
08.09.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
25.08.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.08.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.07.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.07.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
05.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.08.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.08.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|