|
22.01.2021 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2021 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
22.01.2021 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2021 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2021 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2021 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2021 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2021 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2020 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.11.2020 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.11.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.11.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.11.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.11.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.11.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.2020 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.06.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.06.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.09.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.09.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2019 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2019 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no declaration of maintenance of the application/non-reply to the Written Opinion) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2019 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2018 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2018 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2018 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2018 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
07.08.2018 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2018 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.07.2018 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2017 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2017 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.2017 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.09.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
09.06.2017 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.05.2017 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2016 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
27 |