EP3293418 - BACK KNOCKING MECHANISM AND KNOCKING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hangzhou Deyu Precision Machinery Manufacturing Co., Ltd. No. 7 Mingyuan Road Gaohong Town Lin'an, Zhejiang 311300 / CN | [2018/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Jingliang No. 7 Mingyuan Road Gaohong Town Lin'an Zhejiang 311300 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Jing No. 7 Mingyuan Road Gaohong Town Lin'an Zhejiang 311300 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Lidan No. 7 Mingyuan Road Gaohong Town Lin'an Zhejiang 311300 / CN | [2018/11] | Representative(s) | Proi World Intellectual Property GmbH Obermattweg 12 6052 Hergiswil, Kanton Nidwalden / CH | [2020/24] |
Former [2018/11] | ProI European Patent Attorneys Postfach 2123 90711 Fürth / DE | Application number, filing date | 15881697.5 | 17.06.2015 | [2018/11] | WO2015CN81663 | Priority number, date | CN20151068411 | 10.02.2015 Original published format: CN201510068411 | [2018/11] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016127536 | Date: | 18.08.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3293418 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3293418 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F16H37/12, F16H33/02, A61H23/00, H02K7/16, A61H23/02 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
A61H23/006 (EP);
F16H37/12 (EP,CN);
A61H23/00 (CN);
A61H23/0254 (EP);
F16H33/02 (EP,CN);
H02K7/116 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2018/11] | F16H37/12, F16H33/02, A61H23/00, H02K7/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RÜCKWÄRTSKLOPFMECHANISMUS UND KLOPFVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2018/11] | English: | BACK KNOCKING MECHANISM AND KNOCKING METHOD THEREFOR | [2018/11] | French: | MÉCANISME DE CHOC EN RETOUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE CHOC CORRESPONDANT | [2018/11] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2017 | Translation filed | 21.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/11] | 21.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/11] | 21.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/20] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation | 21.12.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 21.12.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.01.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 21.12.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 21.12.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.01.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 21.12.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 21.12.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.01.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 21.12.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 21.12.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.01.2018 | Decision despatched | 21.12.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 21.12.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.01.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 21.12.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 21.12.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.01.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 11.09.2017 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.12.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.06.2015 | AL | 10.06.2020 | AT | 10.06.2020 | CY | 10.06.2020 | CZ | 10.06.2020 | DK | 10.06.2020 | EE | 10.06.2020 | ES | 10.06.2020 | FI | 10.06.2020 | HR | 10.06.2020 | LT | 10.06.2020 | LV | 10.06.2020 | MC | 10.06.2020 | MK | 10.06.2020 | MT | 10.06.2020 | NL | 10.06.2020 | PL | 10.06.2020 | RO | 10.06.2020 | RS | 10.06.2020 | SE | 10.06.2020 | SI | 10.06.2020 | SK | 10.06.2020 | SM | 10.06.2020 | TR | 10.06.2020 | IE | 17.06.2020 | LU | 17.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | BG | 10.09.2020 | NO | 10.09.2020 | GR | 11.09.2020 | IS | 10.10.2020 | PT | 12.10.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 17.06.2015 | |
AL | 10.06.2020 | ||
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CY | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
MT | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
TR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IE | 17.06.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
IE | 17.06.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
IE | 17.06.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 10.06.2020 | |
NO | 10.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3424149 (FUJIMOTO SHINICHIRO) [A] 1,4* column 1 - column 2, line 54; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US6083181 (MARCANTONI EGIDIO [IT]) [A] 1,4 * column 1, line 1 - column 5, line 47; figures 1-8 *; | [A]CN2432931Y (ZUO YUEJIN [CN]) [A] 1,4 * abstract *; | [A]CN203814978U (TAO ZHIPING) [A] 1,4 * abstract * | International search | [A]CN2432931Y (ZUO YUEJIN [CN]) [A] 1-4 * , description, paragraphs [0003]-[0010] *; | [A]CN201154070Y (DONGYUN WU [CN]) [A] 1-4 * , the whole document *; | [A]KR101215900B (JUNG IN GYOO [KR]) [A] 1-4* , the whole document *; | [A]CN203576876U (CHONGQING INDUSTRY POLYTECHNIC COLLEGE) [A] 1-4 * , the whole document *; | [PX]CN104633038 (HANGZHOU DEYU PREC MACHINERY CO LTD) [PX] 1-4 * , claims 1-4 *; | [E]CN204477234U (HANGZHOU DEYU PREC MACHINERY CO LTD) [E] 1-3 * , claims 1-3 * |