EP3259960 - AIRFIELD RUNWAY LAMP CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road P.O.Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2017/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAWDA, Nipun Kumar Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | [2018/24] |
Former [2017/52] | 01 /
CHAWDA, Nipun Kumar Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2017/52] | Application number, filing date | 15882857.4 | 20.02.2015 | [2017/52] | WO2015US16775 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016133530 | Date: | 25.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3259960 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3259960 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/02, H05B33/08 | [2018/41] | CPC: |
H05B45/50 (EP,US);
H05B39/00 (US);
B64F1/18 (US);
H05B45/54 (US);
H05B47/23 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/52] | H05B37/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUGPLATZSTARTBAHNSCHEINWERFERSTEUERGERÄT | [2017/52] | English: | AIRFIELD RUNWAY LAMP CONTROLLER | [2017/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE FEU DE PISTE D'ATTERRISSAGE D'AÉRODROME | [2017/52] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 14.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/52] | 14.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.02.2015 | AL | 12.02.2020 | AT | 12.02.2020 | CY | 12.02.2020 | CZ | 12.02.2020 | DK | 12.02.2020 | EE | 12.02.2020 | ES | 12.02.2020 | FI | 12.02.2020 | HR | 12.02.2020 | IT | 12.02.2020 | LT | 12.02.2020 | LV | 12.02.2020 | MC | 12.02.2020 | MK | 12.02.2020 | MT | 12.02.2020 | NL | 12.02.2020 | PL | 12.02.2020 | RO | 12.02.2020 | RS | 12.02.2020 | SE | 12.02.2020 | SI | 12.02.2020 | SK | 12.02.2020 | SM | 12.02.2020 | TR | 12.02.2020 | IE | 20.02.2020 | LU | 20.02.2020 | BE | 29.02.2020 | CH | 29.02.2020 | LI | 29.02.2020 | BG | 12.05.2020 | NO | 12.05.2020 | GR | 13.05.2020 | IS | 12.06.2020 | PT | 05.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 20.02.2015 | |
AL | 12.02.2020 | ||
AT | 12.02.2020 | ||
CY | 12.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
MT | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IE | 20.02.2020 | ||
LU | 20.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 20.02.2015 | |
AT | 12.02.2020 | ||
CY | 12.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
MT | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IE | 20.02.2020 | ||
LU | 20.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
IE | 20.02.2020 | ||
LU | 20.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
IE | 20.02.2020 | ||
LU | 20.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
LU | 20.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
LU | 20.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
LU | 20.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 12.02.2020 | |
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
LU | 20.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 12.02.2020 | |
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
LU | 20.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
NO | 12.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]WO2005038476 (TYCO PROJECTS AUSTRALIA PTY LT [AU], et al) [I] 1,8 * page 4, line 19 - page 8, line 21; figure 5 * [Y] 6,7; | [IY]US2011285320 (KUSTRA JAMES [US]) [I] 1-5,8-15 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0031]; figure 2 * [Y] 6,7; | [A]US2012104972 (TAUBERT TIMOTHY A [US]) [A] 1-8* paragraphs [0003] , [0042] , [0060]; figure 4 *; | [Y]US2014246987 (HUA GUICHAO [CN], et al) [Y] 6,7 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2005030192 (WEAVER JAMES T [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0018]-[0022] and [0030]-[0043]; and figures 1 and 3. *; | [A]US2011031896 (VANDEVOORDE JEAN-CLAUDE [BE], et al) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0018]-[0023] and figure 1. *; | [XY]US2011285320 (KUSTRA JAMES [US]) [X] 1-15, 17-20 * See paragraphs [0015], [0020], [0023], and [0025]-[0030]; claims 6 and 12; and figures 3C-4. * [Y] 16; | [Y]US2012268036 (DUBROVSKY LEO [US]) [Y] 16 * See paragraphs [0014]-[0017]; claims 1-4; and figures 1-2. *; | [A]US2014042923 (YU YOUNG GYU [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0031]-[0060] and figures 1-2. * |