EP3264704 - TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING DEVICE AND METHOD IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2018/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Eunsung IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Wookbong IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
CHOI, Jinsoo IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 04 /
CHO, Hangyu IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2018/01] | Representative(s) | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [2018/01] | Application number, filing date | 15883452.3 | 04.08.2015 | [2018/01] | WO2015KR08125 | Priority number, date | US201562119267P | 23.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562119267 P | [2018/01] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016137064 | Date: | 01.09.2016 | Language: | KO | [2016/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3264704 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3264704 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W84/12, H04L1/00, H04L5/00, H04L27/26 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
H04L1/0023 (EP,US);
H04L27/26 (KR,US);
H04L1/004 (EP,US);
H04L1/0075 (EP,US);
H04L1/0079 (US);
H04L27/2613 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L5/0007 (EP,US);
H04L5/0048 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L5/0064 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/44] | H04L27/26, H04L5/00, H04W72/04 | ||
Former IPC [2018/01] | H04L27/26, H04L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENDE- UND EMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2018/01] | English: | TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING DEVICE AND METHOD IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2018/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION ET DE RÉCEPTION DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2018/01] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2016 | Translation filed | 17.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2016 | Examination requested [2018/01] | 17.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.08.2015 | AL | 20.10.2021 | AT | 20.10.2021 | CY | 20.10.2021 | CZ | 20.10.2021 | DK | 20.10.2021 | EE | 20.10.2021 | ES | 20.10.2021 | FI | 20.10.2021 | HR | 20.10.2021 | IT | 20.10.2021 | LT | 20.10.2021 | LV | 20.10.2021 | MC | 20.10.2021 | MK | 20.10.2021 | MT | 20.10.2021 | NL | 20.10.2021 | PL | 20.10.2021 | RO | 20.10.2021 | RS | 20.10.2021 | SE | 20.10.2021 | SI | 20.10.2021 | SK | 20.10.2021 | SM | 20.10.2021 | TR | 20.10.2021 | BG | 20.01.2022 | NO | 20.01.2022 | GR | 21.01.2022 | IS | 20.02.2022 | PT | 21.02.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 04.08.2015 | |
AL | 20.10.2021 | ||
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CY | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
IT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
MK | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
TR | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 04.08.2015 | |
AL | 20.10.2021 | ||
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CY | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
IT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
MK | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 04.08.2015 | |
AL | 20.10.2021 | ||
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CY | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
IT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 04.08.2015 | |
AL | 20.10.2021 | ||
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
IT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
IT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 20.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2010260159 (ZHANG HONGYUAN [US], et al) [Y] 2-6,8-12 * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0100] * * paragraph [0145] * [A] 1,7; | [IY]US2013202001 (ZHANG HONGYUAN [US]) [I] 1,7 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0068] * * figures 2, 8 * [Y] 2-6,8-12; | [XP]WO2015061729 (MARVELL WORLD TRADE LTD [BB], et al) [XP] 1,2,7,8 * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0108] * * paragraph [0161] - paragraph [0165] * * figures 16, 26 *; | [E]WO2016081378 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [E] 1,2,7,8 * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [00149] * * figures 4, 5A, 5B, 5C, *; | [XP] - SHAHRNAZ AZIZI (INTEL CORPORATION), "OFDMA Numerology and Structure ; 11-15-0330-01-00ax-ofdma-numerology-and-structure", IEEE 802.11-15/0330R1, IEEE-SA MENTOR, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, (20150309), vol. 802.11ax, no. 1, pages 1 - 38, XP068082961 [XP] 1,2,7,8 * page 8 - page 16 * | [A] - Jinsoo Choi ET AL, "doc.: IEEE 11-14/0804r1 Envisioning 11ax PHY Structure -Part I Date: 2014-07-14 Name Affiliations Address Phone email", (20140714), URL: https://mentor.ieee.org/802.11/dcn/14/11-14-0804-01-00ax-envisioning-11ax-phy-structure-part-i.pptx, (20151118), XP055229337 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2010260159 (ZHANG HONGYUAN [US], et al) [Y] 2-6, 8-12 * See paragraphs [0145], [0146] and figure 21B. *; | [A]US2012269142 (PORAT RON [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0089]-[0094] and figures 5, 6. *; | [XY]US2013202001 (ZHANG HONGYUAN [US]) [X] 1, 7 * See paragraphs [0036], [0037], [0041]-[0048], [0065]-[0067] and figures 2, 6, 8. * [Y] 2-6, 8-12; | [A]US2013266086 (YANG LIN [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0224], [0225], [0228] and figures 10,11,14. *; | [A]US2014205029 (SRINIVASA SUDHIR [US], et al) [A] 1-12* See paragraphs [0173]-[0224] and figures 1, 3, 17-23. * |