EP3266178 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MUTUAL-AID COLLUSIVE ATTACK DETECTION IN ONLINE VOTING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2018/02] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FENG, Jingyu Weiguo Road Xi'an Universtity of Posts&Telecommunications Xi'an Shaanxi 710121 / CN | 02 /
LU, Guangyue Weiguo Road Xi'an Universtity of Posts&Telecommunications Xi'an Shaanxi 710121 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Honggang Weiguo Road Xi'an Universtity of Posts&Telecommunications Xi'an Shaanxi 710121 / CN | [2018/02] | Representative(s) | Laine IP Oy Porkkalankatu 24 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2018/02] | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 15884193.2 | 06.03.2015 | [2018/02] | WO2015CN73777 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016141510 | Date: | 15.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3266178 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/00, G06Q50/26, G06Q30/06, H04L29/06 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
G06Q50/26 (EP,US);
H04L63/1416 (US);
G06Q30/0631 (EP,US);
G06Q50/01 (EP,US);
H04L63/1425 (US);
G06Q2230/00 (EP,US);
G07C13/00 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/02] | H04L29/06, G06Q30/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG VON KOLLUSIVEN ANGRIFFEN MIT GEGENSEITIGER HILFE IN ONLINE-ABSTIMMUNGSSYSTEMEN | [2018/02] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MUTUAL-AID COLLUSIVE ATTACK DETECTION IN ONLINE VOTING SYSTEMS | [2018/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR DÉTECTION D'ATTAQUE COLLUSOIRE PAR AIDE MUTUELLE DANS DES SYSTÈMES DE VOTE EN LIGNE | [2018/02] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/02] | 27.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.09.2020 | 30.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/34] | 09.04.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/34] | 03.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2009150229 (SHUSTER GARY STEPHEN [US]) [I] 1-14 * abstract ** paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * | International search | [A]US2008137856 (JA BEOM GU [KR], et al) [A] 1-37* the whole document *; | [X]CN101345627 (INST OF SOFTWARE CAS [CN]) [X] 1-2, 13-14, 25-26, 37 * description, page 5, the first paragraph to page 10, the last paragraph, and figures 1 to 2 *; | [A]CN101610184 (INST OF SOFTWARE CAS [CN]) [A] 1-37 * the whole document * |