EP3271329 - NOVEL HYDROPHILIC LINKERS AND LIGAND-DRUG CONJUGATES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hangzhou Dac Biotech Co., Ltd Building 12, ZhengTaiZhongZi Technology Park No. 260 Sixth Street, HEDA Hangzhou City, Zhejiang Province 310018 / CN | [2018/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Sanxing 452 Sixth Street Building 2 Room B2005 Hangzhou Zhejiang 310018 / CN | 02 /
ZHAO, Robert Yongxin 452 Sixth Street Building 2 Room B2005 Hangzhou Zhejiang 310018 / CN | 03 /
LI, Xing 452 Sixth Street Building 2 Room B2005 Hangzhou Zhejiang 310018 / CN | 04 /
GUO, Huihui 452 Sixth Street Building 2 Room B2005 Hangzhou Zhejiang 310018 / CN | 05 /
JIA, Junxiang 452 Sixth Street Building 2 Room B2005 Hangzhou Zhejiang 310018 / CN | 06 /
XIE, Hongsheng 452 Sixth Street Building 2 Room B2005 Hangzhou Zhejiang 310018 / CN | 07 /
ZHOU, Xiaomai 452 Sixth Street Building 2 Room B2005 Hangzhou Zhejiang 310018 / CN | 08 /
HUANG, Yuanyuan 452 Sixth Street Building 2 Room B2005 Hangzhou Zhejiang 310018 / CN | 09 /
YANG, Qingliang 452 Sixth Street Building 2 Room B2005 Hangzhou Zhejiang 310018 / CN | 10 /
ZHUO, Xiaotao 452 Sixth Street Building 2 Room B2005 Hangzhou Zhejiang 310018 / CN | 11 /
YE, Hangbo 452 Sixth Street Building 2 Room B2005 Hangzhou Zhejiang 310018 / CN | 12 /
GAI, Shun 452 Sixth Street Building 2 Room B2005 Hangzhou Zhejiang 310018 / CN | 13 /
QU, Lan 452 Sixth Street Building 2 Room B2005 Hangzhou Zhejiang 310018 / CN | 14 /
LI, Wenjun 452 Sixth Street Building 2 Room B2005 Hangzhou Zhejiang 310018 / CN | 15 /
LIN, Chen 452 Sixth Street Building 2 Room B2005 Hangzhou Zhejiang 310018 / CN | [2018/04] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/33] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2018/04] | Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 15885301.0 | 19.03.2015 | [2018/04] | WO2015IB52011 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016147031 | Date: | 22.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3271329 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3271329 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/68, C07D207/404, C07D207/327, C07F9/6558, C07K16/28, A61P35/00, C07F9/572, C07K16/00, C07D207/46 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
C07F9/572 (EP,US);
A61K47/68033 (EP,US);
A61K47/6811 (US);
A61K47/6849 (US);
A61K47/6851 (US);
A61K47/6889 (US);
C07D207/46 (EP,US);
C07F9/65583 (EP,US);
C07K16/00 (US);
C07K16/2878 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/18] | C07D207/404, C07D207/327, C07F9/6558, C07K16/28, A61P35/00, C07F9/572, C07K16/00, C07D207/46, A61K47/68 | ||
Former IPC [2018/04] | C07D207/404, C07D207/327, C07F9/38, C07K16/28, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE HYDROPHILE LINKER UND LIGANDENARZNEIMITTELKONJUGATE DAVON | [2018/04] | English: | NOVEL HYDROPHILIC LINKERS AND LIGAND-DRUG CONJUGATES THEREOF | [2018/04] | French: | NOUVEAUX LIEURS HYDROPHILES ET CONJUGUÉS LIGAND-MÉDICAMENT LES COMPRENANT | [2018/04] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 08.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21184933.6 / EP3912982 | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 18.08.2021 | CY | 18.08.2021 | CZ | 18.08.2021 | EE | 18.08.2021 | HR | 18.08.2021 | LT | 18.08.2021 | LV | 18.08.2021 | MK | 18.08.2021 | MT | 18.08.2021 | RO | 18.08.2021 | RS | 18.08.2021 | SI | 18.08.2021 | SK | 18.08.2021 | SM | 18.08.2021 | BG | 18.11.2021 | IS | 18.12.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MK | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | CZ | 18.08.2021 | |
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 18.08.2021 | |
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | HR | 18.08.2021 | |
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | LT | 18.08.2021 | |
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | LT | 18.08.2021 | |
BG | 18.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006107175 (INKTEC CO LTD [KR], et al); | [XI]WO2012143497 (BAYER IP GMBH [DE], et al); | [X]US2013144541 (RYCHNOVSKY SCOTT [US], et al); | [X]WO2014080251 (HANGZHOU DAC BIOTECH CO LTD [CN], et al); | [XAI]WO2014151030 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [XAI]WO2015028850 (HANGZHOU DAC BIOTECH CO LTD [CN]) | International search | [A]WO2010126551 (IMMUNOGEN INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2012143497 (BAYER IP GMBH [DE], et al); | [X]WO2014080251 (HANGZHOU DAC BIOTECH CO LTD [CN], et al) | Examination | EP3041846 | by applicant | WO2014080251 | WO2015028850 |