EP3271686 - POSITION DETERMINING UNIT AND A METHOD FOR DETERMINING A POSITION OF A LAND OR SEA BASED OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vricon Systems Aktiebolag Hus 207-3 581 88 Linköping / SE | [2018/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGLUND, Leif Rängenvägen 16 590 45 Brokind / SE | 02 /
BEJERYD, Johan Valhallagatan 26 B 582 44 Linköping / SE | 03 /
FROSTAD, Bård Västgötagatan 1 411 39 Göteborg / SE | [2020/33] |
Former [2018/04] | 01 /
HAGLUND, Leif Rängenvägen 16 S-590 45 Brokind / SE | ||
02 /
BEJERYD, Johan Valhallagatan 26 B S-582 44 Linköping / SE | |||
03 /
FROSTAD, Bård Västgötagatan 1 S-411 39 Göteborg / SE | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/04] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 15885695.5 | 19.03.2015 | [2018/04] | WO2015SE50325 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016148619 | Date: | 22.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3271686 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3271686 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/04, G01C21/20, G01C21/00, G01C21/16, G01C21/30, G01S19/20, G01S19/48 | [2020/29] | CPC: |
G01C21/203 (EP);
G01C21/04 (EP,US);
G01C21/005 (EP,US);
G01C21/1652 (EP,US);
G01C21/20 (EP,US);
G01C21/30 (EP,US);
G01S19/20 (EP,US);
G01S19/396 (EP);
G01S19/42 (US);
G01S19/48 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/46] | G01C21/04, G01C21/20, G01C21/00 | ||
Former IPC [2018/04] | G01C21/04, G01C21/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POSITIONSBESTIMMUNGSEINHEIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER POSITION EINES LAND- ODER MEERBASIERTEN OBJEKTS | [2018/04] | English: | POSITION DETERMINING UNIT AND A METHOD FOR DETERMINING A POSITION OF A LAND OR SEA BASED OBJECT | [2018/04] | French: | UNITÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE POSITION ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'UNE POSITION D'UN OBJET BASÉ SUR TERRE OU EN MER | [2018/04] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 08.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.03.2015 | AL | 23.12.2020 | AT | 23.12.2020 | CY | 23.12.2020 | CZ | 23.12.2020 | DK | 23.12.2020 | EE | 23.12.2020 | HR | 23.12.2020 | LT | 23.12.2020 | LV | 23.12.2020 | MC | 23.12.2020 | MK | 23.12.2020 | MT | 23.12.2020 | NL | 23.12.2020 | RO | 23.12.2020 | RS | 23.12.2020 | SI | 23.12.2020 | SK | 23.12.2020 | SM | 23.12.2020 | IE | 19.03.2021 | LU | 19.03.2021 | BG | 23.03.2021 | GR | 24.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | CH | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | IS | 23.04.2021 | PT | 23.04.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 19.03.2015 | |
AL | 23.12.2020 | ||
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CY | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
MK | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 19.03.2015 | |
AL | 23.12.2020 | ||
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CY | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CY | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HR | 23.12.2020 | |
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HR | 23.12.2020 | |
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | HR | 23.12.2020 | |
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | HR | 23.12.2020 | |
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | LV | 23.12.2020 | |
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | RS | 23.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1974277 (MALCHI TOMER [IL], et al) [X] 1,15 * paragraphs [0021] - [0023] - [0 31] - [0034] - [0 38] , [0 65] , [0 70] - [0071] - [0 85] - [0089] - [0 92]; figures 1-15 * * paragraphs [0110] - [0111] - [ 114] * [I] 2-14; | [XI]WO2009098154 (TELE ATLAS NORTH AMERICA INC [US], et al) [X] 1,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 10] - [0011] - [0 14] , [0 32] , [0 39] - [0046]; figures 1-10 * [I] 2-14; | [XI]EP2133662 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0 13] - [0014] - [0 16] , [0 27] - [0028] - [0 32]; figures 1-4 * [I] 2-14; | [XI]WO2011047730 (TELE ATLAS BV [NL], et al) [X] 1,15 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 16] , [0 18] - [0019] - [0 21] - [0022]; figures 2-5 * [I] 2-14; | [XI]US2014225771 (PHUYAL BISHNU [US], et al) [X] 1,15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0 18] , [0 22] - [0023] - [0 25] - [0032] - [0 34] , [0 37] , [0 40]; figures 1-11 * * paragraphs [0054] - [0059] * [I] 2-14; | [A] - INGEMAR NYGREN, "Terrain navigation for underwater vehicles", ISSN 1103-8039, (20051214), TRITA-S3-SB, TCHNOLOGY, STOCKHOLM, PAGE(S) 1-2,I, URL: http://kth.diva-portal.org/smash/get/diva2:14353/FULLTEXT01, XP002613004 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO0102804 (BAE SYSTEMS PLC [GB], et al); | [A]US6512976 (SABATINO ANTHONY E [US], et al); | [A]EP1677076 (BOEING CO [US]); | [X]EP2133662 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]); | [X]WO2011058507 (NADAM DROR [IL], et al); | [X]US2012203519 (LOUIS CHRISTIAN [FR], et al) |