EP3276712 - SECONDARY BATTERY POSITIVE-ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taiheiyo Cement Corporation 3-5 Daiba 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 135-8578 / JP | [2018/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMASHITA, Hiroki c/o TAIHEIYO CEMENT CORPORATION Research&Development Center 4-2 Osaku 2-chome Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8655 / JP | 02 /
HATSUMORI, Tomoki c/o TAIHEIYO CEMENT CORPORATION Research&Development Center 4-2 Osaku 2-chome Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8655 / JP | 03 /
NAKAMURA, Atsushi c/o TAIHEIYO CEMENT CORPORATION Research&Development Center 4-2 Osaku 2-chome Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8655 / JP | 04 /
OGAMI, Takaaki c/o TAIHEIYO CEMENT CORPORATION Research&Development Center 4-2 Osaku 2-chome Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8655 / JP | [2018/05] | Representative(s) | Schiener, Jens Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstraße 8 80333 München / DE | [2018/05] | Application number, filing date | 15886443.9 | 17.09.2015 | [2018/05] | WO2015JP76386 | Priority number, date | JP20150064613 | 26.03.2015 Original published format: JP 2015064613 | JP20150065940 | 27.03.2015 Original published format: JP 2015065940 | JP20150178162 | 10.09.2015 Original published format: JP 2015178162 | JP20150178163 | 10.09.2015 Original published format: JP 2015178163 | [2018/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016151891 | Date: | 29.09.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3276712 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3276712 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/58, C01B25/45, C01B33/20, H01M4/36, H01M4/04, H01M4/136, H01M4/1397, H01M4/62, // H01M10/052, H01M10/054, H01M10/0525 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
H01M4/628 (EP,US);
H01M4/366 (EP,KR,US);
C01B25/45 (EP,KR,US);
C01B33/20 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/0471 (EP,US);
H01M4/136 (EP,US);
H01M4/1397 (EP,US);
H01M4/5825 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/625 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2004/80 (KR);
C01P2006/40 (KR);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M10/054 (EP,US);
H01M2004/028 (US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/05] | H01M4/58, C01B25/45, C01B33/20, H01M4/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POSITIVELEKTRODENAKTIVMATERIAL EINER SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2018/05] | English: | SECONDARY BATTERY POSITIVE-ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2018/05] | French: | MATIÈRE ACTIVE D'ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELLE-CI | [2018/05] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2017 | Translation filed | 22.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 22.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/05] | 22.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.09.2015 | AL | 16.09.2020 | AT | 16.09.2020 | CY | 16.09.2020 | CZ | 16.09.2020 | DK | 16.09.2020 | EE | 16.09.2020 | ES | 16.09.2020 | FI | 16.09.2020 | HR | 16.09.2020 | IT | 16.09.2020 | LT | 16.09.2020 | LV | 16.09.2020 | MC | 16.09.2020 | MK | 16.09.2020 | MT | 16.09.2020 | PL | 16.09.2020 | RO | 16.09.2020 | RS | 16.09.2020 | SE | 16.09.2020 | SI | 16.09.2020 | SK | 16.09.2020 | SM | 16.09.2020 | TR | 16.09.2020 | IE | 17.09.2020 | LU | 17.09.2020 | NL | 23.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | FR | 16.11.2020 | BG | 16.12.2020 | NO | 16.12.2020 | GR | 17.12.2020 | IS | 16.01.2021 | PT | 18.01.2021 | [2023/29] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 17.09.2015 | |
AL | 16.09.2020 | ||
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CY | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
MK | 16.09.2020 | ||
MT | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
TR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IE | 17.09.2020 | ||
LU | 17.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 16.11.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 17.09.2015 | |
AL | 16.09.2020 | ||
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CY | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
MT | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
TR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IE | 17.09.2020 | ||
LU | 17.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 16.11.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
IE | 17.09.2020 | ||
LU | 17.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 16.11.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
IE | 17.09.2020 | ||
LU | 17.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
LU | 17.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
LU | 17.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
LU | 17.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
LU | 17.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 16.09.2020 | |
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
NO | 16.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2008131777 (HATTA NAOKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraphs [0040] , [0041] , [0054] , [0055] * [Y] 3; | [A]US2010276632 (BARKER JEREMY [GB], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [Y]JP2012238554 (TOYOTA IND CORP, et al) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0082] *; | [Y] - MINKI JO ET AL, "Carbon-coated nanoclustered LiMnFePOcathode for lithium-ion batteries", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, ELSEVIER SA, CH, vol. 216, doi:10.1016/J.JPOWSOUR.2012.05.059, ISSN 0378-7753, (20120521), pages 162 - 168, (20120528), XP028411856 [Y] 1,3,5-9 * paragraph [02.1] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpowsour.2012.05.059 | [Y] - YANG-KOOK SUN ET AL, "The Role of AlF3 Coatings in Improving Electrochemical Cycling of Li-Enriched Nickel-Manganese Oxide Electrodes for Li-Ion Batteries", ADVANCED MATERIALS, DE, (20120224), vol. 24, no. 9, doi:10.1002/adma.201104106, ISSN 0935-9648, pages 1192 - 1196, XP055266279 [Y] 1,3-10 * page 1195, column right * * page 1192, paragraph left * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adma.201104106 | [Y] - KONSTANTINOV ET AL, "New approach for synthesis of carbon-mixed LiFePO"4 cathode materials", ELECTROCHIMICA A, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, GB, (20041130), vol. 50, no. 2-3, doi:10.1016/J.ELECTACTA.2004.05.049, ISSN 0013-4686, pages 421 - 426, XP005147968 [Y] 1,4-8,10 * paragraph [0002] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.electacta.2004.05.049 | International search | [XYA]WO2005041327 (MITSUI SHIPBUILDING ENG [JP], et al) [X] 1, 4 * , claims 1 to 11; paragraphs [0047] to [0054], [0156] to [0159] & US 2008/0131777 A1 claims 1 to 11; paragraphs [0051] to [0058], [0175] to [0180] & EP 1689011 A1 & CA 2543851 A & KR 10-2006-0132576 A & KR 10-1156828 B1 * [Y] 1, 3-5 [A] 2, 6-10; | [YA]JP2011210693 (EQUOS RES CO LTD) [Y] 1, 3-5 * , paragraphs [0021], [0022], [0027] (Family: none) * [A] 2, 6-10; | [A]JP2013524440 (Envia Systems, Inc.) [A] 7* , claims 5, 6; paragraphs [0069], [0070] & US 2011/0244331 A1 claims 5, 6; paragraphs [0088] to [0090] & WO 2011/123264 A2 & EP 2553749 A2 & CN 102823034 A & KR 10-2013-0019399 A *; | [YA]WO2013128936 (TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI KK [JP], et al) [Y] 1, 3-5 * , claims 6 to 12; paragraphs [0035], [0078], [0111] (Family: none) * [A] 2, 6-10; | [YA]WO2014063244 (HYDRO QUÉBEC [CA], et al) [Y] 1, 3-5 * , claims 1, 12, 16, 17; paragraphs [0027], [0044], [0051] to [0053], [0069] to [0071] & US 2015/0270554 A1 & CA 2794290 A & JP 2015-532514 A * [A] 2, 6-10; | [YA]JP2014143032 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 1, 3, 5 * , claims 1 to 3, 11; paragraphs [0035], [0064], [0065], [0076] to [0083] (Family: none) * [A] 2, 4, 6-10 | Examination | US2012129052 |