EP3274923 - METHOD FOR SHAPE CLASSIFICATION OF AN OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK, SM | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KLA - Tencor Corporation One Technology Drive Milpitas, California 95035 / US | [2018/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERMANS, Laurent De Villegasplein 2 2150 Botsbeek / BE | 02 /
DELFOSSE, Eric Weggevoerdenstraat 54 34500 Hasselt / BE | 03 /
NIJS, Frans Nieuwstraat 48 3971 Leopoldsburg / BE | 04 /
THISSEN, Francis Wipstraat 6 3010 Kessel-Lo / BE | 05 /
DE GREEVE, Johan Latstraat 4 Lovenjoel 3360 Brabant / BE | [2018/05] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/05] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 15886698.8 | 19.08.2015 | [2018/05] | WO2015US45961 | Priority number, date | US201562137650P | 24.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562137650 P | [2018/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016153546 | Date: | 29.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3274923 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3274923 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06V10/42, G06V10/75, G06V20/64, G06V20/66 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
G06V20/653 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06V10/757 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06V10/421 (EP,KR,US);
G06V20/66 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/42] | G06K9/48, G06K9/62, G06K9/50, G06K9/00 | ||
Former IPC [2018/05] | G06K9/48, G06K9/62 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FORMKLASSIFIZIERUNG EINES OBJEKTS | [2018/05] | English: | METHOD FOR SHAPE CLASSIFICATION OF AN OBJECT | [2018/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR CLASSIFIER LA FORME D'UN OBJET | [2018/05] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/05] | 19.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2023 | DK | 04.10.2023 | ES | 04.10.2023 | HR | 04.10.2023 | LT | 04.10.2023 | LV | 04.10.2023 | PL | 04.10.2023 | RS | 04.10.2023 | SE | 04.10.2023 | SM | 04.10.2023 | BG | 04.01.2024 | NO | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | PT | 05.02.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 04.10.2023 | |
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 05.01.2024 | |
IS | 04.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO03032129 (LASER PROJECTION TECHNOLOGIES [US], et al); | [Y]US2009248356 (KRIEGMAIR JOSEF [DE]); | [XY]US2012033873 (OZEKI RYOSUKE [JP], et al) | International search | [A]US2007127754 (SLABAUGH GREGORY G [US], et al); | [Y]US2009033947 (BOYER JESSE R [US], et al); | [A]US2009110301 (SCHOPP THOMAS [DE], et al); | [Y]US2010316280 (LANCASTER SIMON [CA], et al); | [A]EP2765554 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY [JP]) |