EP3273855 - CONTACT SENSING SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EPiX Therapeutics, Inc. 2880 Lakeside Drive, Suite 250 Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2018/52] |
Former [2018/05] | For all designated states Advanced Cardiac Therapeutics, Inc. 2880 Lakeside Drive Suite 250 Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSON, Jessi E. 2880 Lakeside Drive Suite 250 Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 02 /
PANESCU, Dorin 2880 Lakeside Drive Suite 250 Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2018/05] | Representative(s) | Crease, Devanand John, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2018/05] | Application number, filing date | 15886706.9 | 18.11.2015 | [2018/05] | WO2015US61311 | Priority number, date | US201562138338P | 25.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562138338 P | US201562195717P | 22.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562195717 P | US201562243289P | 19.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562243289 P | [2018/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016153561 | Date: | 29.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3273855 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14, A61B18/00, A61B18/12 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP);
A61B5/6885 (EP);
A61B2018/00297 (EP);
A61B2018/00827 (EP);
A61B2018/00875 (EP);
A61B2018/00892 (EP);
A61B2018/128 (EP);
A61B2090/065 (EP);
A61B5/053 (EP);
A61B5/287 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/05] | A61B5/053 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/05] | Title | German: | KONTAKTSENSORSYSTEME UND VERFAHREN | [2018/05] | English: | CONTACT SENSING SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2018/05] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE DÉTECTION DE CONTACT | [2018/05] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/05] | 07.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/24] | Divisional application(s) | EP20171803.8 / EP3750500 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2016081650 (ADVANCED CARDIAC THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [E] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5673704 (MARCHLINSKI FRANCIS E [US], et al) [Y] 2-5, 10-14, 21-41 * entire document *; | [XY]US2008312521 (SOLOMON EDWARD G [US]) [X] 1, 6-9, 57-62, 64-74, 179-182 * entire document * [Y] 2-5, 10-14, 21-41; | [XY]US2010286690 (PAUL SAURAV [US], et al) [X] 121-133, 137 * entire document * [Y] 4, 5; | [A]US2012189998 (KRUECKER JOCHEN [US], et al) [A] 1-14, 21-41, 44-74, 121-133, 137, 179-182* entire document *; | [Y]US2012265076 (SCHECTER STUART O [US]) [Y] 14 * entire document *; | [A]US2014051959 (GLINER VADIM [IL], et al) [A] 1-14, 21-41, 44-74, 121-133, 137, 179-182 * entire document *; | [A]US2014249521 (MCCARTHY JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-14, 21-41, 44-74, 121-133, 137, 179-182 * entire document * |