EP3178900 - CROSSLINKED FLUID TREATMENT AND METHODS FOR FRACTURING UNDERGROUND FORMATIONS BASED ON FLOWBACK, PRODUCTION WATER, SEAWATER, FRESH WATER, AND MIXTURES OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.2019 [2019/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sotro Financial, Inc. Parque Empresarial Forum 1 Edificio A Piso 2 Santa Ana San José de Costa Rica / CR | [2017/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERMAN BORGOGNO, Fabio Encarnación Ezcurra 365 Piso 4º C Buenos Aires C1107CLA / AR | [2017/24] | Representative(s) | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Edificio Aqua - Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2017/24] | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Cedaceros, 1 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 15887389.3 | 16.12.2015 | [2017/24] | WO2015IB59685 | Priority number, date | AR2015P100952 | 30.03.2015 Original published format: AR P150100952 | [2017/24] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016156956 | Date: | 06.10.2016 | Language: | ES | [2016/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3178900 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 06.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C09K8/04, C09K8/10, C09K8/68, E21B21/00, C09K8/88, C09K8/90 | [2018/03] | CPC: |
C09K8/887 (EP,US);
C09K8/24 (US);
C09K8/10 (EP,US);
C09K8/487 (US);
C09K8/602 (US);
C09K8/685 (EP,US);
C09K8/90 (EP,US);
E21B43/26 (EP,US);
C09K2208/22 (US);
C09K8/605 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/24] | C09K8/04, C09K8/10, C09K8/68, E21B21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/24] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VERNETZTER FLUIDE UND VERFAHREN ZUM FRACKING VON UNTERIRDISCHEN FORMATIONEN AUF GRUNDLAGE VON RÜCKFLUSS, PRODUKTIONSWASSER, MEERWASSER, SÜSSWASSER UND GEMISCHE DAVON | [2017/24] | English: | CROSSLINKED FLUID TREATMENT AND METHODS FOR FRACTURING UNDERGROUND FORMATIONS BASED ON FLOWBACK, PRODUCTION WATER, SEAWATER, FRESH WATER, AND MIXTURES OF SAME | [2017/24] | French: | FLUIDE DE TRAITEMENT RÉTICULÉ ET PROCÉDÉS DE FRACTURATION DE FORMATIONS SOUTERRAINES À BASE D'EAU DE RETOUR, D'EAU DE PRODUCTION, D'EAU DE MER, D'EAU DOUCE ET DE MÉLANGES DE CELLES-CI | [2017/24] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2017 | Translation filed | 09.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/24] | 09.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/02] | 24.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5877127 (CARD ROGER JOHN [US], et al) [I] 1-3 * examples 1-21; claim 1; table 2 *; | [A]US6310008 (RIETJENS MARCEL [NL]) [A] 1-3* column 4, line 22 - column 5, line 20; example 1; claims 1,2,5,6,11,13; table 1 *; | [A]US2014194327 (HUTCHINGS NATHAN R [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [0028] , [0029] , [0034] , [0039]; claims 1,10,15,18 *; | [A]US2014364343 (NELSON TYLER HEATH [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [0021] , [0027] , [0029] , [0031] , [0033] , [0038]; claims 1,5-7,12,13,16,21 * | International search | [X]US2006027364 (KELLY PATRICK A [US], et al) [X] 1-3* , paragraphs[16] - [31]; examples 1-3. *; | [X]MX2013009561 (SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY BV [NL]) [X] 1-3 * , page 9, lines 17 - 28; page 17, lines 4 - 25; claims 1-15. *; | [X]US2013261032 (LADVA HEMANT K J [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * , paragraphs [72] -[ 96], [108]. *; | [X]MX2014010101 (TUCC TECHNOLOGY LLC [US]) [X] 1-3 * , page 19, line 20 - page 20, line 20; page 21, lines 15 - 23; page 22, line 6 - page 23, line 15; page 25, lines 1 - 10; page 28, lines 5 - 21; page 30, lines 4 - 22. * |