EP3283630 - OLIGONUCLEOTIDE FRAGMENT, AND METHOD AS WELL AS APPLICATION OF SELECTIVE AMPLIFICTION OF VARIANT OF TARGET NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCE USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuhigh Biotechnologies Co., Ltd Suite 301 C8 218 Xinghu Road Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | [2018/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BI, Wanli Suite 301 C8 218 Xinghu St. Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Zhifeng Suite 301 C8 218 Xinghu St. Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 03 /
XU, Xin Suite 301 C8 218 Xinghu St. Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou Jiangsu 215123 / CN | [2018/08] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/30] |
Former [2018/08] | HGF Limited Delta House 50 West Nile Street Glasgow G1 2NP / GB | Application number, filing date | 15888914.7 | 18.06.2015 | [2018/08] | WO2015CN81818 | Priority number, date | CN201510177952 | 15.04.2015 Original published format: CN201510177952 | [2018/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016165210 | Date: | 20.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3283630 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3283630 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, C12N15/10, C12Q1/68, C12Q1/6858, C12Q1/6853 | [2018/46] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6858 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6853 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6853, C12Q2525/117, C12Q2525/125, C12Q2525/301 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6858, C12Q2525/107, C12Q2525/125, C12Q2525/301 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6858, C12Q2525/113, C12Q2525/125, C12Q2525/301 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6858, C12Q2525/117, C12Q2525/125, C12Q2525/301 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2018/08] | C12N15/11, C12N15/10, C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OLIGONUKLEOTIDFRAGMENT UND VERFAHREN SOWIE ANWENDUNG VON SELEKTIVER AMPLIFIKATION VON VARIANTEN EINER ZIELNUKLEINSÄURESEQUENZ DAMIT | [2018/08] | English: | OLIGONUCLEOTIDE FRAGMENT, AND METHOD AS WELL AS APPLICATION OF SELECTIVE AMPLIFICTION OF VARIANT OF TARGET NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCE USING THE SAME | [2018/08] | French: | FRAGMENT OLIGONUCLÉOTIDIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ AINSI QU'APPLICATION D'AMPLIFICATION SÉLECTIVE D'UN VARIANT DE SÉQUENCE D'ACIDE NUCLÉIQUE CIBLE L'UTILISANT | [2018/08] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2017 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 23.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2023 | CZ | 26.07.2023 | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | IT | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | NL | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SE | 26.07.2023 | SI | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 26.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0963443 (GENETRACE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 1-3 * paragraphs [0019] , [0021] - [0022] *; | [Y]US2003073101 (OLSON JEFFREY [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * figures 16-18,26-31 * * paragraphs [0118] - [0120] - [0128] - [0130] - [0235] - [0285] - [0286] - [0290] * * example 1 *; | [Y]US2007264653 (BERLIN KURT [DE], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0176] , [ 191] - [0193] - [0238] , [ 425] - [0428] * * claims 1-19,22-24 *; | [Y]WO2013123220 (UNIV CORNELL [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0020] , [0026] - [0028] - [0037] , [0059] , [0062] , [0070] , [0089] - [0091] * * figures 6,8 *; | [Y] - RAND KEITH N ET AL, "Headloop suppression PCR and its application to selective amplification of methylated DNA sequences", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, GB, (20050101), vol. 33, no. 14, doi:10.1093/NAR/GNI120, ISSN 1362-4962, pages e127 - 1, XP002515951 [Y] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gni120 | [A] - SOLINAS A ET AL, "Duplex Scorpion primers in SNP analysis and FRET applications", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, INFORMATION RETRIEVAL LTD, (20011015), vol. 29, no. 20, doi:10.1093/NAR/29.20.E96, ISSN 0305-1048, page E96, XP002318909 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/29.20.e96 | International search | [A]CN1580277 (FUWEI BIOLOG SCIENCE TECHNOLOG [CN]) [A] 1-11 * see claim 1 *; | [A]WO2011100057 (SPIER EUGENE [US]) [A] 1-11* see claim 1 and figure 10 * | by applicant | US4469863 | US4912199 | US5034506 | US5137806 | US5210015 | US5216141 | US5235033 | US5273991 | US5338671 | US5386023 | US5411876 | US5538848 | US5602240 | US5637684 | US5637621 | US5639611 | US5644048 | WO9728123 | US5677152 | US5698674 | US5753629 | WO9821202 | US5773528 | US5840867 | US5877280 | US5990303 | EP0963443 | WO0174898 | US6326145 | WO0200650 | US2003073101 | WO03059881 | US2007264653 | US7408051 | WO2013123220 | - HENRIK et al., Nucleic Acid Research, (19930000), vol. 21, pages 5332 - 5336 | - LUO et al., Nucleic Acid Research, (20060000), vol. 34, no. 2, page e12 | - VOGELSTEIN BKINZLER KW, "Digital PCR", Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (19990000), vol. 96, doi:10.1073/pnas.96.16.9236, pages 9236 - 41, XP002185144 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.16.9236 | - BIELAS JHLOEB LA, "Quantification of random genomic mutations", Nat Methods, (20050000), vol. 2, pages 285 - 90 | - LI JWANG LMAMON HKULKE MHBERBECO RMAKRIGIORGOS GM, "Replacing PCR with COLD-PCR enriches variant DNA sequences and redefines the sensitivity of genetic testing", Nat Med, (20080000), vol. 14, pages 579 - 84 | - GASTER, J.MARX, A, Chem. Eur.J., (20050000), vol. 11, pages 1861 - 1870 | - SEELA et al., Helv.Chim. Acta, (19990000), vol. 82, page 1640 | - BEAUCAGE et al., Tetrahedron, (19930000), vol. 49, no. 10, page 1925 | - MAG et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19910000), vol. 19, page 1437 | - BRIU et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19890000), vol. 111, page 2321 | - EGHOLM, J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19920000), vol. 114, page 1895 | - DENPCY et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19950000), vol. 92, page 6097 | - JENKINS et al., Chem. Soc. Rev., (19950000), pages 169 - 176 | - SONDHI et al., Curr. Med. Chem., (19970000), vol. 4, page 313 | - REDDY et al., Pharmacology & Therapeutics, (19990000), vol. 84, page 1 | - WEMMER, Biopolymers, (20010000), vol. 52, page 197 | - DERVAN, Bioorg. Med. Chem., (20010000), vol. 9, page 2215 | - Anti-Cancer Drug Design, (19900000), vol. 5, page 3 | - Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19920000), vol. 89, page 7586 | - Biochemistry, (19930000), vol. 32, page 4237 | - Science, (19940000), vol. 266, page 647 | - Anti-Cancer Drug Design, (19950000), vol. 10, page 155 | - Bioorg Med. Chem., (20000000), vol. 8, page 985 | - Mol. Biol., (20000000), vol. 34, page 357 | - J Am. Chem. Soc., (19920000), vol. 114, no. 15, page 5911 | - Biochemistry, (19920000), vol. 31, page 8349 | - Bioconjugate Chem., (19940000), vol. 5, page 475 | - Biochem. Biophys. Res. Commun., (19960000), vol. 222, page 764 | - J Med.Chem., (20000000), vol. 43, page 3257 | - Tetrahedron, (20000000), vol. 56, page 5225 | - Molecular Pharmacology, (19980000), vol. 54, page 280 | - Bioorg Med. Chem. Lett., (19960000), vol. 6, no. 18, page 2169 | - J. Med. Chem., (20020000), vol. 45, page 805 | - Bioorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (20020000), vol. 12, page 2007 |