EP3285224 - EXPERIMENTAL DATA RECORDING DEVICE, COMPUTER PROGRAM, EXPERIMENTAL DATA, EXPERIMENTAL DATA RECORDING METHOD, EXPERIMENTAL DATA DISPLAY DEVICE AND EXPERIMENTAL DATA DISPLAY METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | For all designated states Robotic Biology Institute Inc. 1-33-9, Kakinokizaka Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-0022 / JP | [2018/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NATSUME, Toru c/o National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-26 Aomi 2-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-0064 / JP | 02 /
MATSUKUMA, Kenji c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1 Kurosaki-Shiroishi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | 03 /
UMENO, Makoto c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1 Kurosaki-Shiroishi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | 04 /
IPPOSHI, Tatsuro c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1 Kurosaki-Shiroishi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | [2018/08] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/08] | Application number, filing date | 15889138.2 | 13.04.2015 | [2018/08] | WO2015JP61389 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016166800 | Date: | 20.10.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3285224 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/00, G06F17/30 | [2018/41] | CPC: |
G06Q50/00 (EP,US);
G06F16/211 (US);
G06F16/122 (EP,US);
G06F16/13 (EP,US);
G06F16/26 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/08] | G06Q50/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/08] | Title | German: | VERSUCHSDATENAUFZEICHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG, COMPUTERPROGRAMM, VERSUCHSDATEN, VERSUCHSDATENAUFZEICHNUNGSVERFAHREN, VERSUCHSDATENANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND VERSUCHSDATENANZEIGEVERFAHREN | [2018/08] | English: | EXPERIMENTAL DATA RECORDING DEVICE, COMPUTER PROGRAM, EXPERIMENTAL DATA, EXPERIMENTAL DATA RECORDING METHOD, EXPERIMENTAL DATA DISPLAY DEVICE AND EXPERIMENTAL DATA DISPLAY METHOD | [2018/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ARCHIVAGE DE DONNÉES EXPÉRIMENTALES, PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE, DONNÉES EXPÉRIMENTALES, PROCÉDÉ D'ARCHIVAGE DE DONNÉES EXPÉRIMENTALES, DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE DE DONNÉES EXPÉRIMENTALES ET PROCÉDÉ D'AFFICHAGE DE DONNÉES EXPÉRIMENTALES | [2018/08] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2017 | Translation filed | 10.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 10.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/13] | 17.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.09.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004073558 (SCHRIJVERS TOM AMANDUS JOZEF [BE], et al) [I] 1-20* paragraphs [0011] - [0034]; figures 1-7 *; | [XI]US2006172422 (DZEKUNOV SERGEY M [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8-20 * paragraphs [0005] , [0025] , [0036] , [0041] - [0043] - [0056] - [0057] - [0062] , [0085] , [0090]; figures 1-9 * [I] 5,7 | International search | [YA]JP2001511529 (Affymetrix, Inc.) [Y] 2, 13 * , paragraph [0052] & WO 1999/005591 A2 & US 6229911 B1 & EP 1396800 A2 * [A] 1, 3-12, 14-20; | [A]JP2004530860 (Clinical Micro Sensors, Inc.) [A] 1-20* , entire text; all drawings & WO 2001/054813 A2 & US 2002/0177135 A1 & EP 1246699 A2 *; | [YA]JP2004534207 (Tibotec BVBA) [Y] 7 * , paragraph [0012] & WO 2002/065334 A1 & US 2004/0073558 A1 & EP 1360617 A1 * [A] 1-6, 8-20; | [A]JP2006178691 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-20 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2008519285 (Invitrogen Corp.) [A] 1-20 * , entire text; all drawings & WO 2006/060125 A2 & US 2006/0199196 A1 & EP 1812605 A2 *; | [XY]JP2008521437 (Maxcyte, Inc.) [X] 1, 3-6, 8-12, 14-20 * , paragraphs [0038] to [0040], [0053] to [0054], [0064] to [0075]; fig. 5 to 9 & WO 2006/060409 A2 & US 2006/0172422 A1 & EP 1817406 A2 & KR 10-2007-0091163 A * [Y] 2, 7, 13 |