EP3285193 - METHOD FOR PREDICTING ORGAN TRANSPLANT REJECTION USING NEXT-GENERATION SEQUENCING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eone Diagnomics Genome Center Co., Ltd. 291 Harmony-ro Yeonsu-gu Incheon 406-840 / KR | [2018/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Min Seob 291 Harmony-ro Yeonsu-gu Incheon 406-840 / KR | 02 /
KWON, Sun Jae 291 Harmony-ro Yeonsu-gu Incheon 406-840 / KR | [2018/08] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2018/08] | Application number, filing date | 15889288.5 | 11.06.2015 | [2018/08] | WO2015KR05905 | Priority number, date | KR20150052649 | 14.04.2015 Original published format: KR 20150052649 | [2018/08] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016167408 | Date: | 20.10.2016 | Language: | KO | [2016/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3285193 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/22, G06F19/10, C12Q1/68 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
G16B30/00 (EP,CN,US);
C12Q1/6869 (CN,US);
C12Q1/68 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6827 (CN);
C12Q1/6876 (CN);
C12Q1/6881 (US);
C12Q1/6883 (US);
G01N33/49 (EP,US);
G16B99/00 (EP,CN,US);
C12Q2600/106 (CN,US);
C12Q2600/156 (CN,US);
C12Q2600/16 (CN,US);
G01N2800/245 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2537/143 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VORHERSAGE DER ORGANTRANSPLANTATABSTOSSUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON SEQUENZIERUNG DER NÄCHSTEN GENERATION | [2018/08] | English: | METHOD FOR PREDICTING ORGAN TRANSPLANT REJECTION USING NEXT-GENERATION SEQUENCING | [2018/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE PRÉDIRE LE REJET D'UNE GREFFE D'ORGANE AU MOYEN D'UN SÉQUENÇAGE DE NOUVELLE GÉNÉRATION | [2018/08] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2017 | Translation filed | 14.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 14.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/07] | 12.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2012115851 (HOPE CITY [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0046] - [0086] *; | [I]WO2014194113 (CHRONIX BIOMEDICAL [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0039] - [0102] *; | [I]US2015086477 (MITCHELL AOY TOMITA [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0064] - [0188] *; | [I] - T. M. SNYDER ET AL, "Universal noninvasive detection of solid organ transplant rejection", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20110328), vol. 108, no. 15, doi:10.1073/pnas.1013924108, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 6229 - 6234, XP055129832 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1013924108 | [ ] - T. M. SNYDER ET AL, "Universal noninvasive detection of solid organ transplant rejection - supporting information", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, US, (20110328), vol. 108, no. 15, doi:10.1073/pnas.1013924108, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 6229 - 6234, XP055524568 [ ] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1013924108 | [I] - I. DE VLAMINCK ET AL, "Circulating Cell-Free DNA Enables Noninvasive Diagnosis of Heart Transplant Rejection", SCIENCE TRANSLATIONAL MEDICINE, US, (20140618), vol. 6, no. 241, doi:10.1126/scitranslmed.3007803, ISSN 1946-6234, pages 241ra77 - 241ra77, XP055501377 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/scitranslmed.3007803 | [A] - BORSTING C ET AL, "Validation of a single nucleotide polymorphism (SNP) typing assay with 49 SNPs for forensic genetic testing in a laboratory accredited according to the ISO 17025 standard", FORENSIC SCIENCE INTERNATIONAL: GENETICS, ELSEVIER BV, NETHERLANDS, vol. 4, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.FSIGEN.2009.04.004, ISSN 1872-4973, (20091201), pages 34 - 42, (20090507), XP026789912 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fsigen.2009.04.004 | International search | [A]US2011230358 (RAVA RICHARD P [US]) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0060]-[0062], = [0118]-[034]; and figure 4. *; | [A]KR20120031838 (SAMSUNG SDS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See claims 16, 21: and figure 1. *; | [A]KR20140024270 (FOUNDATION MEDICINE INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0004], [0095]-[0096], and figure 1a . *; | [X]US2014336056 (ERLICH HENRY [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0007], [0029]-[0038], [0048], [0051]; and claims 1, 3, 19, 24. *; | [A]KR20150035847 (MACROGEN INC. et al.) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0005], [0012], [0032], [0150]; and figures 1-6. * |