13.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
31.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
29.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
02.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
19.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] |
02.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
04.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
07.10.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.11.2022 [2022/45] |
16.09.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.10.2022 [2022/42] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
29.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
20.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
06.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
29.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
15.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2022 [2022/20] |
29.10.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] |
25.10.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.10.2021 |
Change - German title |
published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] |
08.10.2021 |
Change - English title |
published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] |
08.10.2021 |
Change - French title |
published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] |
05.10.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
05.10.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
05.10.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.07.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.11.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.10.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.07.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.04.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
31.01.2020 |
First examination report |
|
25.01.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.12.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
23.10.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.10.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.03.2019 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] |
29.03.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] |
29.03.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] |
19.12.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
07.12.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 09.01.2019 [2019/02] |
07.12.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.01.2019 [2019/02] |
24.10.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.07.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
20.07.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
20.07.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
17.07.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.06.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.05.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.10.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.05.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.11.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
16.11.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.11.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
31.10.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|