Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016175823 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US28448 | 30.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10565084 | Global Dossier | 18.02.2020 | B2 | US2018089054 | 29.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US28448 | 30.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3289478 | Global Dossier | 07.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US28448 | 30.04.2015 |