Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2983914 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2021 | C | CA2983914 | 03.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US28763 | 01.05.2015 | US201514700247 | 30.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2015392985B | Global Dossier | 31.01.2019 | B2 | AU2015392985 | 16.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US28763 | 01.05.2015 | US201514700247 | 30.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3288682 | Global Dossier | 22.12.2021 | B1 | EP3288682 | 23.01.2019 | A4 | EP3288682 | 07.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US28763 | 01.05.2015 | US201514700247 | 30.04.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016175867 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514700247 | 30.04.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10232378 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2019 | B2 | US2016318028 | 03.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514700247 | 30.04.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2017002735 | 16.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514700247 | 30.04.2015 |