EP3293749 - CONTACTOR AND CONTACTOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sooar (Beijing) Investment Management Group Co., Ltd. No. 29 Jinyuan Road Daxing Industrial Development Zone Beijing 102600 / CN | [2018/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAN, Yin No. 29 Jinyuan Road Daxing Industrial Development Zone Beijing 102600 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Congli No. 29 Jinyuan Road Daxing Industrial Development Zone Beijing 102600 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Mingliang No. 29 Jinyuan Road Daxing Industrial Development Zone Beijing 102600 / CN | 04 /
MENG, Lingqian No. 29 Jinyuan Road Daxing Industrial Development Zone Beijing 102600 / CN | [2018/11] | Representative(s) | Angerhausen, Christoph Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2018/11] | Application number, filing date | 15891251.9 | 30.12.2015 | [2018/11] | WO2015CN99753 | Priority number, date | CN201510224939 | 05.05.2015 Original published format: CN201510224939 | [2018/11] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016177009 | Date: | 10.11.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3293749 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01H50/54, H01H9/38 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
H01H9/38 (EP,US);
H01H50/54 (CN,US);
H01H9/34 (US);
H01H50/00 (CN);
H01H9/30 (CN);
H01H2235/01 (US)
|
Former IPC [2018/11] | H01H50/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/11] | Title | German: | SCHÜTZ UND SCHÜTZSYSTEM | [2018/11] | English: | CONTACTOR AND CONTACTOR SYSTEM | [2018/11] | French: | CONTACTEUR ET UN SYSTÈME DE CONTACTEUR | [2018/11] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2017 | Translation filed | 02.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/11] | 02.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/50] | 26.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1821758U (ELEKTRO APPAMATE WERKE J W STA [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 5, paragraph l ** figure 3 *; | [A]US6417749 (KAPPEL MARK A [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 7, line 67 - column 8, line 5 * * column 9, line 43 - line 67 * * column 12, line 63 - line 65 * * figures 3, 10, 15, 17 * | International search | [A]US4421959 (CHEN C GREGORY [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *; | [XYA]CN101217076 (CHINA PEOPLE ELECTRIC APPLIANC [CN]) [X] 7-8 * , description, embodiment 1, and figures 1-4, description, embodiment 1, and figures 1-4, description, embodiment 1, and figures 1-4 * [Y] 9-10 [A] 1-6; | [A]CN102290278 (CHINA XD ELECTRIC CO., LTD.) [A] 1-10* , the whole document *; | [Y]CN102800530 (BEIJING PEOPLES ELECTRIC PLANT) [Y] 9-10 * , description, paragraphs [0038]-[0041], and figures 3-4 *; | [A]JP2014102894 (FUJI ELEC FA COMPONENTS & SYS) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *; | [PX]CN104779120 (SHOURUI BEIJING INVEST MAN GROUP CO LTD) [PX] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs [0048]-[0062], and figures 1-8 *; | [PX]CN204632678U (SHOURUI BEIJING INVEST MAN GROUP CO LTD) [PX] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs [0048]-[0062], and figures 1-8 * |