EP3289483 - SECURE MULTI-PARTY INFORMATION RETRIEVAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Entit Software LLC 1140 Enterprise Way, Building G Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2018/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAFAI, Mehran 1501 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | 02 /
SHANG, Hongwei 1501 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | 03 /
MITCHELL, April Slayden 1501 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | [2018/10] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/10] | HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 15891346.7 | 01.05.2015 | [2018/10] | WO2015US28896 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016178655 | Date: | 10.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3289483 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06F21/00 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
G06F21/602 (EP,US);
G06F16/24578 (EP,US);
G06F21/6227 (US);
G06F21/6254 (EP,US);
H04L9/3239 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2115 (EP,US);
H04L2209/46 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERE WIEDERAUFFINDUNG VON MEHRPARTEIENINFORMATIONEN | [2018/10] | English: | SECURE MULTI-PARTY INFORMATION RETRIEVAL | [2018/10] | French: | EXTRACTION D'INFORMATIONS MULTIPARTIES SÉCURISÉES | [2018/10] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 30.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/10] | 30.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.02.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2007038602 (WEYAND TINA [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0016]-[0017] and [0038]-[0046]; and figure 4. *; | [A]US2013173917 (CLIFTON CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0014], [0025], and [0033]-[0037]; claim 18; and figures 1 and 5. *; | [A]US2013191329 (DOZIER CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0010]-[0011] and [0032]-[0046]; and figure 2. *; | [A]EP2650798 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0006]-[0007] and [0199]-[0210]; and figure 12. *; | [A]US2014281578 (BENNISON JAMES E [US]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0007]-[0011] and figure 2. * |