EP3299449 - STRAIN CGMCC NO. 11060 FOR PRODUCING L-LACTIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/13] | POLYMER GRADE LACTIC ACID MONOMER PRODUCTION BACTERIA AND CONSTRUCTION METHODS THEREOF AND TECHNOLOGY FOR MANUFACTURING LACTIC ACID | ||
[2019/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tianjin University Of Science And Technology No. 29 13th Street TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | [2018/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Zhengxiang No.29 13th Avenue TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | 02 /
TIAN, Kangming No.29 13th Avenue TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | 03 /
NIU, Dandan No.29 13th Avenue TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | 04 /
LU, Fuping No.29 13th Avenue TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | [2018/13] | Representative(s) | Kayahan, Senem, et al Yalciner Patent and Consulting Ltd. Tunus Cad. No: 85/3-4 Kavaklidere Cankaya 06680 Ankara / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/13] | Inal, Aysegul Seda, et al Yalciner Patent and Consulting Ltd. Tunus Cad. 85/4 06680 Kavaklidere, Ankara / TR | Application number, filing date | 15892420.9 | 03.11.2015 | [2018/13] | WO2015CN93686 | Priority number, date | CN201510262769 | 21.05.2015 Original published format: CN201510262769 | [2018/13] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016184044 | Date: | 24.11.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3299449 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3299449 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/21, C12P7/56, C12R1/19 | [2018/13] | CPC: |
C12P7/56 (EP,US);
C12N1/205 (US);
C12N15/52 (EP);
C12N9/0006 (EP);
C12Y101/01027 (EP);
C12Y101/01028 (EP);
C12R2001/07 (EP);
C12R2001/19 (EP,US);
C12R2001/245 (EP);
C12R2001/46 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STAMM CGMCC NR. 11060 ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON L-MILCHSÄURE | [2019/10] | English: | STRAIN CGMCC NO. 11060 FOR PRODUCING L-LACTIC ACID | [2019/10] | French: | SOUCHE NO. 11060 POUR LA PRODUCTION D'ACIDE L-LACTIQUE | [2019/10] |
Former [2018/13] | MILCHSÄUREMONOMERPRODUKTIONSBAKTERIEN DER POLYMERKLASSE UND KONSTRUKTIONSVERFAHREN DAVON UND TECHNOLOGIE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MILCHSÄURE | ||
Former [2018/13] | POLYMER GRADE LACTIC ACID MONOMER PRODUCTION BACTERIA AND CONSTRUCTION METHODS THEREOF AND TECHNOLOGY FOR MANUFACTURING LACTIC ACID | ||
Former [2018/13] | BACTÉRIES POUR LA PRODUCTION DE MONOMÈRE D'ACIDE LACTIQUE DE QUALITÉ POLYMÈRE ET PROCÉDÉS DE CONSTRUCTION ASSOCIÉS ET TECHNOLOGIE DE FABRICATION D'ACIDE LACTIQUE | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2017 | Translation filed | 20.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/13] | 30.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 10.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.11.2015 | AL | 24.07.2019 | AT | 24.07.2019 | CY | 24.07.2019 | CZ | 24.07.2019 | DK | 24.07.2019 | EE | 24.07.2019 | ES | 24.07.2019 | FI | 24.07.2019 | HR | 24.07.2019 | IT | 24.07.2019 | LT | 24.07.2019 | LV | 24.07.2019 | MC | 24.07.2019 | MK | 24.07.2019 | MT | 24.07.2019 | NL | 24.07.2019 | PL | 24.07.2019 | RO | 24.07.2019 | RS | 24.07.2019 | SE | 24.07.2019 | SI | 24.07.2019 | SK | 24.07.2019 | SM | 24.07.2019 | TR | 24.07.2019 | BG | 24.10.2019 | NO | 24.10.2019 | GR | 25.10.2019 | IE | 03.11.2019 | LU | 03.11.2019 | IS | 24.11.2019 | PT | 25.11.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 03.11.2015 | |
AL | 24.07.2019 | ||
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CY | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
MT | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IE | 03.11.2019 | ||
LU | 03.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 03.11.2015 | |
AL | 24.07.2019 | ||
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CY | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IE | 03.11.2019 | ||
LU | 03.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CY | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IE | 03.11.2019 | ||
LU | 03.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IE | 03.11.2019 | ||
LU | 03.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
LU | 03.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
LU | 03.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
LU | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 24.07.2019 | |
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 24.07.2019 | |
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | NL | 24.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - DANDAN NIU ET AL, "Highly efficient L-lactate production using engineered Escherichia coli with dissimilar temperature optima for L-lactate formation and cell growth", MICROBIAL CELL FACTORIES, (2014), vol. 13, pages 1 - 11, XP021190648 [X] 1 * See page 4 (Figure 1/B0013-090B) * [Y] 1-12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1475-2859-13-78 | [Y] - LI ZHOU ET AL, "Genetically switched D-lactate production in Escherichia coli", METABOLIC ENGINEERING, (2012), vol. 14, pages 560 - 568, XP055141329 [Y] 1-12 * See page 560 (Abstract) and page 561 (Table 1/B0013) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymben.2012.05.004 | [A] - YOTA TSUGE ET AL, "Recent advances in the metabolic engineering of Corynebacterium glutamicum for the production of lactate and succinate from renewable resources", JOURNAL OF INDUSTRIAL MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20141126), vol. 42, pages 375 - 389, XP035446288 [A] 1-12 * See page 377 (Figure 1) and page 378 (Table 1/B0013-090B3); early online publication * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10295-014-1538-9 | [YP] - KANGMING TIAN ET AL, "Limitation of thiamine pyrophosphate supply to growing Escherichia coli switches metabolism to efficient D-lactate formation", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (20150826), vol. 113, pages 182 - 188, XP002777776 [YP] 1-12 * See page 182 (Abstract/ThiE); early online publication * | International search | [A]CN101544992 (SUZHOU PURIZYMES BIOTECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-12 * , see the whole document *; | [A]CN102618478 (UNIV JIANGNAN) [A] 1-12 * , see claims 1-3 and embodiments 1-4 *; | [A]WO2014107660 (NOVOGY INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * , see the whole document *; | [A]CN104278003 (TIANJIN INST IND BIOTECHNOLOGY CAS) [A] 1-12 * , see the whole document *; | [A]KR20150011111 (SAMSUNG GENERAL CHEMICALS CO [KR]) [A] 1-12 * , see the whole document *; | [A] - TIAN, KANGMING et al., "High-Efficiency L-Lactate Production from Glycerol by Metabolically Engineered Escherichia Coli", CHINESE JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20130925), vol. 29, no. 9, ISSN 1000-3061, pages 1268 - 1277, XP009502999 [A] 1-12 | [A] - J IANG, XU et al., "Recent Developments in L-Lactate Fermentation by Genetically Modified Microorganisms", CHINESE JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20131025), vol. 29, no. 10, ISSN 1000-3061, pages 1398 - 1410, XP009503000 [A] 1-12 * , see the whole document * | [A] - ZHOU, LI et al., "Advance in the Production of Optically Pure D-lactic Acid by Microbial Fermentation", CHINA BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20101231), vol. 30, no. 10, ISSN 1671-8135, pages 114 - 124, XP009503001 [A] 1-12 * , see the whole document * | [A] - ZHOU, SHENGDE et al., "Production of Optically Pure D-Lactic Acid in Mineral Salts Medium by Metabolically Engineered Escherichia Coli W3110", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (20030131), vol. 69, no. 1, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 399 - 407, XP 002904559 [A] 1-12 * , see the whole document * |