EP3306629 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING HIGH-DENSITY INTEGRALLY-MOLDED INDUCTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Poco Holding Co., Ltd. The 5th Industry Park Nantou Beihuan Road Nanshan District Shenzen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Xiongzhi Room 301-306 3/F Blk 2 The 5th Industry Park Nantou Beihuan Rd. Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | 02 /
XIAO, Qiang Room 301-306 3/F Blk 2 The 5th Industry Park Nantou Beihuan Rd. Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | 03 /
RUAN, Jialin Room 301-306 3/F Blk 2 The 5th Industry Park Nantou Beihuan Rd. Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | 04 /
QIU, Jun Room 301-306 3/F Blk 2 The 5th Industry Park Nantou Beihuan Rd. Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | 05 /
LIU, Zhida Room 301-306 3/F Blk 2 The 5th Industry Park Nantou Beihuan Rd. Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | 06 /
LUO, Tao Room 301-306 3/F Blk 2 The 5th Industry Park Nantou Beihuan Rd. Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | 07 /
ZHANG, Yunfan Room 301-306 3/F Blk 2 The 5th Industry Park Nantou Beihuan Rd. Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | LLR 2, rue Jean Lantier 75001 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/17] | LLR 11 boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2018/15] | Jeannet, Olivier, et al LLR Lyon 26 Quai Claude Bernard 69007 Lyon / FR | Application number, filing date | 15893751.6 | 04.06.2015 | [2018/15] | WO2015CN80827 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016192095 | Date: | 08.12.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3306629 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3306629 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01F41/00, H01F41/02, H01F27/02, H01F27/255, H01F1/147, H01F1/26 | [2019/04] | CPC: |
H01F27/022 (EP,US);
H01F17/04 (US);
H01F1/14758 (EP,US);
H01F1/14791 (EP,US);
H01F1/26 (EP,US);
H01F27/255 (EP,US);
H01F41/005 (EP,US);
H01F41/0246 (EP,US);
H01F41/046 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/15] | H01F41/00, H01F17/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HOCHDICHTEN EINSTÜCKIG GEFORMTEN INDUKTORS | [2018/15] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING HIGH-DENSITY INTEGRALLY-MOLDED INDUCTOR | [2018/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE BOBINE D'INDUCTANCE À HAUTE DENSITÉ, MOULÉE EN UN SEUL BLOC | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2017 | Translation filed | 11.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.07.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 09.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.06.2015 | AL | 22.04.2020 | AT | 22.04.2020 | CY | 22.04.2020 | CZ | 22.04.2020 | DK | 22.04.2020 | EE | 22.04.2020 | ES | 22.04.2020 | FI | 22.04.2020 | HR | 22.04.2020 | IT | 22.04.2020 | LT | 22.04.2020 | LV | 22.04.2020 | MC | 22.04.2020 | MK | 22.04.2020 | MT | 22.04.2020 | NL | 22.04.2020 | PL | 22.04.2020 | RO | 22.04.2020 | RS | 22.04.2020 | SE | 22.04.2020 | SI | 22.04.2020 | SK | 22.04.2020 | SM | 22.04.2020 | TR | 22.04.2020 | IE | 04.06.2020 | LU | 04.06.2020 | FR | 22.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | BG | 22.07.2020 | GB | 22.07.2020 | NO | 22.07.2020 | GR | 23.07.2020 | IS | 22.08.2020 | PT | 24.08.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 04.06.2015 | |
AL | 22.04.2020 | ||
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CY | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
MT | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
TR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IE | 04.06.2020 | ||
LU | 04.06.2020 | ||
FR | 22.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GB | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
IE | 04.06.2020 | ||
LU | 04.06.2020 | ||
FR | 22.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GB | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
IE | 04.06.2020 | ||
LU | 04.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GB | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
IE | 04.06.2020 | ||
LU | 04.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
LU | 04.06.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 22.04.2020 | |
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 22.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2008123362 (ZEON CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9* paragraphs [0059] , [0130] , [0184] *; | [Y]EP2051330 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0036] - [0038] *; | [Y]CN104200981 (SHENZHEN POCO MAGNETIC CO LTD) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0036] - [0053] * * table 1 * * claims 1-5 * | International search | [A]CN101552091 (XIANGQUN WANG [CN]) [A] 1-9 * , claim 4 *; | [A]US2010283568 (ZAPF LOTHAR [DE]) [A] 1-9* , claim 1 *; | [Y]CN103151131 (MAGNEQUENCH INC) [Y] 1-9 * , claims 1 and 6 *; | [Y]CN104200981 (SHENZHEN POCO MAGNETIC CO LTD) [Y] 1-9 * , description, paragraphs [0012]-[0026] * |