EP3306656 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MOUNTING SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shindengen Electric Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 2-1 Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAKI, Mitsumasa c/o SHINDENGEN ELECTRIC MANUFACTURING CO. LTD. Factory 10-13 Minami-cho Hanno-shi Saitama 357-8585 / JP | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2018/15] | Application number, filing date | 15894083.3 | 29.05.2015 | [2018/15] | WO2015JP65584 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016194048 | Date: | 08.12.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3306656 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3306656 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/00, H01L23/04, H01L23/495, H01L25/11, H02K11/04, H02K11/33, H02K11/38 | [2018/44] | CPC: |
H01L23/10 (EP);
H02K11/30 (US);
H01L23/04 (US);
H01L23/12 (US);
H01L23/13 (EP);
H01L23/28 (US);
H01L23/49541 (US);
H01L25/07 (US);
H01L25/115 (US);
H01L25/18 (EP,US);
H02K11/00 (US);
H02K11/33 (US);
H02K11/38 (US);
H02K5/225 (US);
H02M7/003 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/15] | H01L23/28, H01L25/07, H01L25/18, H02K11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE DES HALBLEITERBAUELEMENTS | [2018/15] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MOUNTING SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | [2018/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE MONTAGE DE DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2017 | Translation filed | 21.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 21.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 21.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 21.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.05.2015 | AL | 01.04.2020 | AT | 01.04.2020 | CY | 01.04.2020 | CZ | 01.04.2020 | DK | 01.04.2020 | EE | 01.04.2020 | ES | 01.04.2020 | FI | 01.04.2020 | HR | 01.04.2020 | IT | 01.04.2020 | LT | 01.04.2020 | LV | 01.04.2020 | MC | 01.04.2020 | MK | 01.04.2020 | MT | 01.04.2020 | NL | 01.04.2020 | PL | 01.04.2020 | RO | 01.04.2020 | RS | 01.04.2020 | SE | 01.04.2020 | SI | 01.04.2020 | SK | 01.04.2020 | SM | 01.04.2020 | TR | 01.04.2020 | IE | 29.05.2020 | LU | 29.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | FR | 01.06.2020 | BG | 01.07.2020 | NO | 01.07.2020 | GR | 02.07.2020 | IS | 01.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 29.05.2015 | |
AL | 01.04.2020 | ||
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CY | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
MT | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
TR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IE | 29.05.2020 | ||
LU | 29.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 01.06.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
IE | 29.05.2020 | ||
LU | 29.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 01.06.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
IE | 29.05.2020 | ||
LU | 29.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
LU | 29.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 01.04.2020 | |
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 01.04.2020 | |
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | BG | 01.07.2020 | |
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | BG | 01.07.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5737210 (BARAHIA MANOJ M [US]) [Y] 5,7,8 * column 4, lines 8-14; figures 2,3,5 *; | [XY]EP1234761 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,6 * paragraph [0075]; figure 4 * [Y] 5,7,8; | [Y]EP1758165 (SEMIKRON ELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 5,7,8* paragraph [0019]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US7190070 (MANZ YVONE [DE], et al) [Y] 5,7,8 * column 3, lines 58-67; figures 2-7 * * column 4, lines 20-29,40-50 *; | [Y]CN102207269 (PANASONIC ELECTRIC WORKS TATSUNO CO LTD) [Y] 5,7,8 * abstract * | International search | [YA]JPS5961090 (FUJITSU LTD, et al) [Y] 1-4, 6, 7 * , page 2, upper left column, line 4 to lower left column, line 4; fig. 3 to 5 (Family: none) * [A] 5; | [A]JP2013188027 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-7* , entire text; all drawings & US 2015/0097470 A1 & WO 2013/133014 A1 & EP 2824820 A & CN 104205599 A *; | [YA]JP2014183615 (DENSO CORP) [Y] 1-4, 6, 7 * , paragraphs [0017] to [0023]; fig. 3 (Family: none) * [A] 5 |