EP3307211 - A CLOSE-CELL STRUCTURED STENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/16] | A CLOSE-CELL STRUCTURED STENT, A PREPARATION METHOD AND USE THEREOF | ||
[2024/22] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Advanced Medical Technologies, Ltd. Inc. Room A403 5 Kaituo Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2019/43] |
Former [2018/16] | For all designated states Beijing Advanced Medical Technologies, Inc. Room A403 5 Kaituo Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Hugh Qinghong 3722 West Positas Boulevard Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US | 02 /
SHI, Guixin 7777 Dancy Road San Diego, CA 92126 / US | 03 /
GU, Yongquan 6-6-8A Guanshan Park Century City Landianchang Road Haidian District Beijing 100097 / CN | 04 /
LIU, Qing Room A403 5 Kaituo Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2018/17] |
Former [2018/16] | 01 /
ZHAO, Hugh Qinghong 3722 West Positas Boulevard Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US | ||
02 /
SHI, Guixin 688 Rue des Sureaux Unit 4 Boucherville, Québec J4B 0C7 / CA | |||
03 /
GU, Yongquan 6-6-8A Guanshan Park Century City Landianchang Road Haidian District Beijing 100097 / CN | |||
04 /
LIU, Qing Room A403 5 Kaituo Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/16] | Clark, Jane Anne Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 15894621.0 | 11.06.2015 | [2018/16] | WO2015CN81216 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016197351 | Date: | 15.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3307211 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/91 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
A61F2/90 (EP,US);
A61F2/915 (EP,US);
A61F2/07 (US);
A61F2/91 (US);
A61F2/042 (US);
A61F2002/041 (US);
A61F2002/044 (EP,US);
A61F2002/075 (US);
A61F2002/91575 (US);
A61F2210/0004 (US);
A61F2210/0014 (US);
A61F2230/0006 (US);
A61F2230/0019 (US);
A61F2230/0021 (US);
A61F2230/0023 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/16] | A61F2/90 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/16] | Title | German: | GESCHLOSSENZELLIGER STRUKTURIERTER STENT | [2024/22] | English: | A CLOSE-CELL STRUCTURED STENT | [2024/22] | French: | ENDOPROTHÈSE STRUCTURÉE À CELLULES FERMÉE | [2024/22] |
Former [2018/16] | GESCHLOSSENZELLIGER STRUKTURIERTER STENT, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | ||
Former [2018/16] | A CLOSE-CELL STRUCTURED STENT, A PREPARATION METHOD AND USE THEREOF | ||
Former [2018/16] | ENDOPROTHÈSE STRUCTURÉE À CELLULES FERMÉES, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET UTILISATION ASSOCIÉE | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 10.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/16] | 10.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9944543 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5 * page 4, line 12 - page 5, line 12; figures 5,6 *[I] 4,6-10; | [XI]WO0126583 (ENDOSYSTEMS LLC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * page 5, line 25 - page 8, line 28; figures 1-3C,10 * [I] 3,6-10; | [XI]US2012215250 (GRANDFIELD RYAN M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * paragraph [0117]; figures 11A,11B * [I] 3,4,7-10 | International search | [A]CN1087549 (GEN HOSPITLE PLA [CN]) [A] 1-23, 25 * the whole document *; | [Y]CN2577878Y (JIA GUOLIANG [CN]) [Y] 1-23, 25 * description, page 2, line 21 to page 3, line 9 and figure *; | [Y]CN1455657 (MIND GUARD LTD [IL]) [Y] 1-23, 25 * description, page 14, paragraph 3, page 17, line 3, page 12, lines 2-10 and figures 4-5 *; | [Y]CN101259045 (UNIV PLA 2ND MILITARY MEDICAL [CN]) [Y] 14-17 * description, page 3, lines 6-15 and figure 1 *; | [Y]CN101621974 (PIOLAX MEDICAL DEVICES INC) [Y] 18-21 * description, page 6, paragraph 2 and figure 1 *; | [Y]CN102149859 (3D BIOTEK LLC) [Y] 23 * claims 1, 6 *; | [A]WO2014134568 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [A] 1-23, 25* the whole document * | by applicant | US2012215250 | EP2848211 |