EP3307823 - DURABLE DEBRIS AND ALKALINE RESISTANT PREFORMED THERMOPLASTIC RUNWAY PAVEMENT MARKING COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, IT, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ennis-Flint, Inc. 4161 Piedmont Parkway, Suite 370 Greensboro, NC 27410 / US | [2023/13] |
Former [2018/16] | For all designated states Flint Trading, Inc. 115 Todd Court Thomasville, NC 27360 / US | ||
For all designated states Hepler, Bradley 489 Creekwood Drive Lexington, NC 27292 / US | |||
For all designated states Greer, Robert W. 105 Cherokee Drive Lexington, NC 27295 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEPLER, Bradley 489 Creekwood Drive Lexington, NC 27292 / US | 02 /
GREER, Robert, W. 105 Cherokee Drive Lexington, NC 27295 / US | [2018/16] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2023/33] |
Former [2018/16] | Hellmich, Wolfgang European Patent and Trademark Attorney Lortzingstrasse 9 / 2. Stock 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15895130.1 | 19.10.2015 | [2018/16] | WO2015US56240 | Priority number, date | US201514734563 | 09.06.2015 Original published format: US201514734563 | [2018/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016200420 | Date: | 15.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3307823 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3307823 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 15.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08L31/04, C08F210/02, C08L23/08, E01F9/512, E01F9/00 | [2018/16] | CPC: |
E01F9/512 (EP,US);
C08L23/14 (EP,US);
C08L23/16 (EP,US);
C08L93/04 (EP,US);
C08K2003/2241 (EP,US);
C08K2003/265 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/14, C08L23/14, C08L93/04, C08K3/26, C08K3/34 (EP,US);
C08L23/16, C08L23/16, C08K3/26 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LANGLEBIGE, SCHMUTZ- UND ALKALIRESISTENTE, VORGEFORMTE THERMOPLASTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR ROLLBAHNASPHALTMARKIERUNG | [2018/16] | English: | DURABLE DEBRIS AND ALKALINE RESISTANT PREFORMED THERMOPLASTIC RUNWAY PAVEMENT MARKING COMPOSITIONS | [2018/16] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DURABLES DE MARQUAGE DE REVÊTEMENT DE PISTE, THERMOPLASTIQUES, PRÉFORMÉES, RÉSISTANT AUX DÉBRIS ET AUX AGENTS ALCALINS | [2018/16] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/16] | 08.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.2023 | CZ | 16.08.2023 | DK | 16.08.2023 | EE | 16.08.2023 | ES | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | IT | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | MC | 16.08.2023 | NL | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SE | 16.08.2023 | SI | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | LU | 19.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | FR | 31.10.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | DE | 01.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
LU | 19.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
FR | 31.10.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
DE | 01.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
LU | 19.10.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
DE | 01.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
LU | 19.10.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1485253 (TOYO SODA MFG CO LTD)[A] 1-15 | International search | [XY]GB1485253 (TOYO SODA MFG CO LTD) [X] 1-12 * p, 1 lines 80-89 , p. 2 lines 68-84, p. 2 lines 125-129, p. 3 lines 97-100, p.4 line 31 and examples p, 1 lines 80-89 , p. 2 lines 68-84, p. 2 lines 125-129, p. 3 lines 97-100, p.4 line 31 and examples * [Y] 18-33; | [A]US4613632 (ALIANI GIORGIO [BE], et al) [A] 1-33* whole document *; | [A]WO9828133 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-33 * whole document *; | [Y]US2014272331 (TENG GEORGE GANGHUA [US], et al) [Y] 13-33 * abstract, [0032] * | by applicant | GB1485253 | WO9828372 | JPH11209909 | US2003070579 |