Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017063192 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015CN92100 | 16.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10389153 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2019 | B2 | US2017117735 | 27.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015CN92100 | 16.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107005062B | Global Dossier | 17.01.2020 | B | CN107005062 | 01.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015CN92100 | 16.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3179596 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2021 | B1 | EP3179596 | 25.07.2018 | A4 | EP3179596 | 14.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015CN92100 | 16.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI630486B | 21.07.2018 | B | TW201715412 | 01.05.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015CN92100 | 16.10.2015 |