EP3348901 - BOLT-TYPE LOCKING AND FASTENING STRUCTURE AND INSTALLATION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Li, Feng Room 607 Multifunctional Building No.35-1 Xiangyin Road Long Gang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2018/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/29] | Representative(s) | Lang, Christian, et al LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei IP Law Firm Ingolstädter Straße 5 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/29] | Cabinet Chaillot 16/20, avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 15895859.5 | 17.09.2015 | [2018/29] | WO2015CN89841 | Priority number, date | CN201510571434 | 09.09.2015 Original published format: CN201510571434 | [2018/29] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017041319 | Date: | 16.03.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3348901 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F21V17/10, F21V31/00, F21V15/01, // F21Y115/10 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
F21V15/01 (EP,US);
F21V17/12 (KR);
F21V17/10 (CN);
F21V17/101 (CN);
F21V17/104 (EP,US);
F21V17/18 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2018/29] | F21V17/10, F21V17/12, F21V17/14, F21V17/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/29] | Title | German: | BOLZENARTIGE VERRIEGELUNGS- UND BEFESTIGUNGSSTRUKTUR UND INSTALLATIONSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2018/29] | English: | BOLT-TYPE LOCKING AND FASTENING STRUCTURE AND INSTALLATION METHOD THEREFOR | [2018/29] | French: | STRUCTURE DE VERROUILLAGE ET DE FIXATION DE TYPE À BOULONS ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'INSTALLATION | [2018/29] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2016 | Translation filed | 23.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 09.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/29] | 27.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/35] | 07.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.03.2019 | 30.09.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002125815 (WAKITA NAOHIDE [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2009168422 (CHIU MEI-CHIH [TW], et al) [X] 1,3 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0022] * * figures 1-3 * [I] 5,7; | [A]KR101010931B (E TECH LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]CN104791637 (LI FENG) [A] 1-10; | [A]DE202014007771U (NORKA NORDDEUTSCHE KUNSTSTOFF [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | EP3296615 [ ] (LI FENG [CN]) [ ] * the whole document * | International search | [X]CN1639619 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-10 * , embodiment 3 *; | [A]KR100947657B (LENS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10* , the whole document * |