EP3314648 - INTEGRATED CIRCUIT STRUCTURES WITH INTERPOSERS HAVING RECESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2018/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Kyu-Oh 400 N Coronado 1076 Chandler, Arizona 85224 / US | 02 /
SALAMA, Islam, A. 9348 N. 109th Place Scottsdale, Arizona 85259 / US | [2018/18] | Representative(s) | Rummler, Felix Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/18] | Rummler, Felix Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15896530.1 | 25.06.2015 | [2018/18] | WO2015US37808 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016209243 | Date: | 29.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3314648 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01L25/065, H01L23/48, H01L23/13, H01L23/498, H01L21/48 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
H01L23/13 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01L23/49838 (CN,KR,US);
H01L21/4853 (CN,KR,US);
H01L21/4857 (CN,KR,US);
H01L23/48 (EP,CN,US);
H01L23/49822 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01L23/49833 (CN,KR,US);
H01L23/50 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01L23/5385 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01L23/66 (CN,KR,US);
H01L24/16 (CN,KR,US);
H01L25/0655 (EP,CN,US);
H01L25/0657 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01L2223/6666 (CN,US);
H01L2224/16157 (CN,US);
H01L2224/16197 (CN,US);
H01L2224/16225 (EP,CN,US);
H01L2924/1205 (CN,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,CN,US);
H01L2924/19041 (EP);
H01L2924/19042 (EP);
H01L2924/19043 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/18] | H01L25/065, H01L23/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/18] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTE SCHALTUNGSSTRUKTUREN MIT INTERPOSERN MIT AUSSPARUNGEN | [2018/18] | English: | INTEGRATED CIRCUIT STRUCTURES WITH INTERPOSERS HAVING RECESSES | [2018/18] | French: | STRUCTURES DE CIRCUIT INTÉGRÉ AVEC ÉLÉMENTS D'INTERPOSITION PRÉSENTANT DES ÉVIDEMENTS | [2018/18] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/18] | 18.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.07.2022 | 13.07.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/48] | 25.07.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005087850 (NISHIKAWA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,10 * paragraphs [0019] , [0047] , [0095] - [0097]; figures 5,6 *[I] 2-9,11-15; | [XI]US2005258548 (OGAWA KOUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7,8,10,12,13,15 * paragraphs [0108] - [0116] - [0180] , [0181]; figures 1,12 * [I] 3,4,6,9,11,14 | International search | [Y]US2007117275 (DCAMP JON B [US], et al) [Y] 1-11, 19-25 * See abstract, paragraph [0026] and figures 1-3. *; | [A]US2009152233 (CHO SUK HYEON [KR], et al) [A] 1-25 * See abstract, paragraphs [0023]-[0028] and figure 1. *; | [Y]US2011068444 (CHI HEEJO [KR], et al) [Y] 1-11, 18-25 * See abstract, paragraphs [0041]-[0047] and figures 3a-3d. *; | [A]US2011278741 (CHUA LINDA PEI EE [SG], et al) [A] 1-25* See abstract, paragraphs [0043]-[0057] and figures 3a-3o. *; | [XY]US2015156880 (DAIZO TOMOYA [JP]) [X] 12-17 * See abstract, paragraphs - and figures 2(A)-8(B), 10. * [Y] 3, 5, 10, 18, 20, 22, 24 | by applicant | US2005087850 | US2005258548 |