EP3314638 - MULTI-HEIGHT FINFET DEVICE BY SELECTIVE OXIDATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.09.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard MS: RNB-4-150 Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | [2018/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Seiyon 13062 NW Corso Lane Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | 02 /
BHIMARASETTI, Gopinath 14802 NW Deerfoot Lane Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | 03 /
RIOS, Rafael 7713 Lenape Trail Austin, Texas 78736 / US | 04 /
KAVALIEROS, Jack T. 3734 NW Bronson Crest Loop Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | 05 /
GHANI, Tahir 14191 NW Stonebridge Drive Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | 06 /
MURTHY, Anand S. 10934 NW Lucerne Court Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | 07 /
MEHANDRU, Rishabh 4606 SW 42nd Place Portland, Oregon 97221 / US | [2018/18] | Representative(s) | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Landaubogen 3 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/18] | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 15 17 23 80050 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15897302.4 | 27.06.2015 | [2018/18] | WO2015US38194 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017003411 | Date: | 05.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3314638 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/336, H01L29/78, H01L27/12 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
H01L29/66795 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01L29/78 (EP,CN,US);
H01L21/02233 (US);
H01L27/0886 (US);
H01L27/1211 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01L29/1037 (US);
H01L29/1083 (US);
H01L29/66545 (US);
H01L29/7831 (KR);
H01L29/785 (EP,CN,US);
H01L29/7851 (US);
H01L29/7855 (KR);
H01L21/02546 (US);
H01L2224/16225 (EP);
H01L23/49827 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/18] | H01L21/336, H01L29/78 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/18] | Title | German: | MEHRHÖHEN-FINFET-VORRICHTUNG DURCH SELEKTIVE OXIDATION | [2018/18] | English: | MULTI-HEIGHT FINFET DEVICE BY SELECTIVE OXIDATION | [2018/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSISTOR À EFFET DE CHAMP À AILETTE (FINFET) À HAUTEURS MULTIPLES OBTENU PAR OXYDATION SÉLECTIVE | [2018/18] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/18] | 22.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4806505 (FRANCIOSI ALFONSO [US]) [Y] 2-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0757379 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [X]US6642090 (FRIED DAVID M [US], et al) [X] 10-12,14,15 * column 6, line 40 - column 7, line 17 * * column 8, line 60 - column 9, line 2 *; | [XY]US2013181263 (CAI XIUYU [US], et al) [X] 1,8-12,14,15 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * [Y] 2-7; | [XI]US2015162436 (TOH ENG HUAT [SG], et al) [X] 1,8-10,12,14,15 * paragraph [0073] * [I] 11; | [E]WO2015199705 (INTEL CORP [US]) [E] 1-5,7-12,14,15 * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * | International search | [A]KR20080071822 (SEOUL NAT UNIV IND FOUNDATION [KR]) [A] 1-22* See paragraphs [0028]-[0059], claims 1-11 and figures 1-9. *; | [A]KR20100026423 (HYNIX SEMICONDUCTOR INC [KR]) [A] 1-22 * See paragraphs [0015]-[0074], claims 1-36 and figures la-3d. *; | [XA]US2014264592 (OXLAND RICHARD KENNETH [BE], et al) [X] 1, 8-10, 15-22 * See paragraphs [0015]-[0022], claims 1-21 and figures 1, 2. * [A] 2-7, 11-14; | [A]US2015102411 (CHING KUO-CHENG [TW], et al) [A] 1-22 * See paragraphs [0012]-[0039], claims 10-21 and figures 1-2. *; | [A]US2015137237 (JACOB AJEY POOVANNUMMOOTTIL [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * See paragraphs [0026]-[0037], claims 1-20 and figures 2a-4. * | by applicant | US6642090 | US2013181263 | US2015162436 |